EP2802208 - TRANSPORTATION BAG FOR USE WITH AN ORGAN TRANSPORTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.06.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 08.04.2020 [2020/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lifeline Scientific, Inc. One Pierce Place, Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | [2014/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRAVITZ, David C. c/o Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 02 /
DEMUYLDER, Peter c/o Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 03 /
OTTS, Brian c/o Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 04 /
MERKLE, Stephan c/o Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 05 /
O'LEARY, Jeremiah P. c/o Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | 06 /
SVENSRUD, Christopher E. c/oLifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | [2016/26] |
Former [2014/47] | 01 /
KRAVITZ, David C. Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | ||
02 /
DEMUYLDER, Peter Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | |||
03 /
OTTS, Brian Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | |||
04 /
MERKLE, Stephan Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | |||
05 /
O'LEARY, Jeremiah P. Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | |||
06 /
SVENSRUD, Christopher E. Lifeline Scientific Inc. One Pierce Place Suite 475W Itasca, Illinois 60143 / US | Representative(s) | Chevalier, Renaud Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | [2014/47] | Application number, filing date | 13700795.1 | 04.01.2013 | [2016/26] | WO2013US20286 | Priority number, date | US201213348195 | 11.01.2012 Original published format: US201213348195 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013106248 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2802208 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802208 | Date: | 29.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, // A61B10/00 | [2016/04] | CPC: |
A01N1/0273 (EP,US);
A61B10/0096 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2014/47] | A01N1/02, A61B10/00, A61B19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRANSPORTBEUTEL ZUR VERWENDUNG MIT EINEM ORGANTRANSPORTER | [2014/47] | English: | TRANSPORTATION BAG FOR USE WITH AN ORGAN TRANSPORTER | [2014/47] | French: | SAC DE TRANSPORT DESTINÉ À ÊTRE UTILISÉ AVEC UN TRANSPORTEUR D'ORGANE | [2014/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 29.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 20.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.01.2013 | AL | 29.06.2016 | AT | 29.06.2016 | BE | 29.06.2016 | CY | 29.06.2016 | CZ | 29.06.2016 | DK | 29.06.2016 | EE | 29.06.2016 | FI | 29.06.2016 | HR | 29.06.2016 | LT | 29.06.2016 | LV | 29.06.2016 | MC | 29.06.2016 | MK | 29.06.2016 | PL | 29.06.2016 | RO | 29.06.2016 | RS | 29.06.2016 | SI | 29.06.2016 | SK | 29.06.2016 | SM | 29.06.2016 | TR | 29.06.2016 | BG | 29.09.2016 | NO | 29.09.2016 | GR | 30.09.2016 | IS | 29.10.2016 | PT | 31.10.2016 | IE | 04.01.2017 | LU | 04.01.2017 | MT | 04.01.2017 | [2020/15] |
Former [2019/51] | HU | 04.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
MK | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 04.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CY | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 04.01.2013 | |
AL | 29.06.2016 | ||
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 29.06.2016 | |
AT | 29.06.2016 | ||
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
MT | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
IE | 04.01.2017 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/02] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
LU | 04.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
MC | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
DK | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SI | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
BG | 29.09.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 29.06.2016 | |
BE | 29.06.2016 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
SM | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
PT | 31.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | BE | 29.06.2016 | |
CZ | 29.06.2016 | ||
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
PL | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
SK | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
IS | 29.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 29.06.2016 | |
EE | 29.06.2016 | ||
FI | 29.06.2016 | ||
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RO | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
GR | 30.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
HR | 29.06.2016 | ||
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
LV | 29.06.2016 | ||
RS | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 29.06.2016 | |
LT | 29.06.2016 | ||
NO | 29.09.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 29.06.2016 | |
NO | 29.09.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2006124149 (AMERICAN THERMAL WIZARDS INTER [US], et al) [X] 1,9,17,18,20 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,14,21-23,26,27 [I] 16,19,25; | [XYI]EP1688124 (E3 CORTEX [FR], et al) [X] 1,17,18,20 * the whole document * [Y] 2-8,14,21-23,26,27 [I] 15,16; | [YD]US6673594 (OWEN DONALD R [US], et al) [YD] 2-8,14,21-23,26,27 * column 12, line 51 - column 16, line 39; figures 19-23 *; | [A]WO9935453 (SAFETHERM S A [CH], et al) [A] 12,13 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1813247 (SANCHEZ TABOAS JORGE HORACIO [ES], et al) [A] 1,20 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6673594 | USD470594S |