EP2810470 - ALLOCATION OF IDENTIFIERS FOR HOME NODE BS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.03.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.11.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [2023/42] |
Former [2019/36] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2014/50] | For all designated states Nokia Solutions and Networks Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHWARZBAUER, Hanns, Juergen Edelweissstraße 2A 82194 Gröbenzell / DE | 02 /
SELVAGANAPATHY, Srinivasan M20 Royal Palm Apartments II Cross LBShastry Nagar HAL Post Bangalore Karanataka 560117 / IN | 03 /
VESELY, Alexander Raabau 119 A-8330 Feldbach / AT | 04 /
TONESI, Dario, Serafino ul. Inowroclawska 39/17 PL-53-649 Wroclaw / PL | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 13701443.7 | 25.01.2013 | [2023/42] | WO2013EP51421 | Priority number, date | IN2012CHE0349 | 30.01.2012 Original published format: IN CH03492012 | [2014/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013113623 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2810470 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2810470 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02, H04W8/26, H04W84/04 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
H04W24/02 (EP,US);
H04W8/26 (EP,US);
H04W84/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUWEISUNG VON IDENTIFIKATOREN ZU HOME NODE B | [2022/47] | English: | ALLOCATION OF IDENTIFIERS FOR HOME NODE BS | [2014/50] | French: | ATTRIBUTION D'IDENTIFICATEURS AUX HOME NODE BS | [2022/47] |
Former [2014/50] | ZUORDNUNG VON IDENTIFIKATOREN FÜR HEIMKNOTEN BS | ||
Former [2014/50] | ATTRIBUTION D'IDENTIFICATEURS POUR DES N UDS B DOMESTIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.07.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.04.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.10.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.11.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.09.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.09.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.09.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.11.2018 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 18.10.2023 | CZ | 18.10.2023 | DK | 18.10.2023 | EE | 18.10.2023 | ES | 18.10.2023 | HR | 18.10.2023 | IT | 18.10.2023 | LT | 18.10.2023 | LV | 18.10.2023 | MC | 18.10.2023 | NL | 18.10.2023 | PL | 18.10.2023 | RO | 18.10.2023 | RS | 18.10.2023 | SE | 18.10.2023 | SK | 18.10.2023 | SM | 18.10.2023 | BG | 18.01.2024 | NO | 18.01.2024 | GR | 19.01.2024 | IS | 18.02.2024 | PT | 19.02.2024 | [2024/40] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
IT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SK | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
CZ | 18.10.2023 | ||
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RO | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
EE | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
DK | 18.10.2023 | ||
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
SM | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
LV | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
PL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
HR | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
RS | 18.10.2023 | ||
SE | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
NO | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 18.10.2023 | |
ES | 18.10.2023 | ||
LT | 18.10.2023 | ||
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
PT | 19.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/21] | LT | 18.10.2023 | |
NL | 18.10.2023 | ||
BG | 18.01.2024 | ||
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | NL | 18.10.2023 | |
GR | 19.01.2024 | ||
IS | 18.02.2024 | ||
Former [2024/17] | NL | 18.10.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2079258 (LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-17 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0019] ** paragraph [0024] *; | [A]WO2011023234 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-17 * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 5 * * page 12, line 13 - line 25 * * page 16, line 20 - line 27 * * page 17, line 23 - page 18, line 8 *; | [XI]GB2482071 (UBIQUISYS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,5,6,8,9,12,13,15-17 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 9 * * page 8, line 23 - page 9, line 4 * * page 16, line 14 - line 26; figure 7 * [I] 3,4,7,10,11,14 |