EP2813086 - TRANSMITTER TRACKING OF VARIOUS STANDARDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hirschmann Car Communication GmbH Stuttgarter Strasse 45-51 72654 Neckartenzlingen / DE | [2014/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUSTERER, Markus Uracher Weg 65 72639 Neuffen / DE | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/51] | Greif, Thomas Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 13702072.3 | 04.02.2013 | WO2013EP52144 | Priority number, date | DE20121002179 | 07.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012002179 | [2014/51] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013117515 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2813086 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/414, H04N21/438, H04N5/44, H04N5/46, H04N5/50 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
H04N5/46 (EP,KR);
H04N21/414 (KR);
H04N21/41422 (EP);
H04N21/438 (KR);
H04N21/4383 (EP);
H04N5/505 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Title | German: | SENDERVERFOLGUNG UNTERSCHIEDLICHER STANDARDS | [2014/51] | English: | TRANSMITTER TRACKING OF VARIOUS STANDARDS | [2014/51] | French: | SUIVI D'ÉMETTEURS UTILISANT DES NORMES DIFFÉRENTES | [2014/51] | Entry into regional phase | 17.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 26.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 14.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US6741293 (OBUCHI MASASHI [JP]) [X] 1-6 * column 1, lines 54-59 * * column 2, lines 12-33,51-58 * * column 7, lines 50-67 * * column 10, line 65 - column 11, line 7 * * figure 1 *; | [I]DE102010007883 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [I] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0007] *; | [A]EP1003333 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-6 * paragraphs [0005] - [0008] *; | [A]WO2006076948 (HIRSCHMANN ELECTRONICS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-6 * page 6, lines 3-20 * | by applicant | DE102005039507 |