Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Patent family: EP2812700 Family dossiers alerts: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):  

AU2013217935 AU2018202302 CA2863819 CA3133249 CN201380019055 CN201810781584 EP13703112 EP18162713 EP2013052619W EP21170448

More

IL23399814 IL25409517 IL28450621 JP2014556086 JP2017126712 JP2020109710 US201314377887 US201615237728 US201916687726 US202117507994



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated





TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9726668Global Dossier 08.08.2017B2
US2015017630 15.01.2015A1
Priority number Date
US201314377887 08.02.2013
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US12188934Global Dossier 07.01.2025B2
US2022042994 10.02.2022A1
Priority number Date
US201615237728 16.08.2016
US202117507994 22.10.2021
US201916687726 19.11.2019
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201414377887 11.08.2014
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US11175291Global Dossier 16.11.2021B2
US2020088728 19.03.2020A1
Priority number Date
US201615237728 16.08.2016
US201916687726 19.11.2019
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201414377887 11.08.2014
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US10502739Global Dossier 10.12.2019B2
US2017030909 02.02.2017A1
Priority number Date
US201615237728 16.08.2016
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201414377887 11.08.2014
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
JP6169619BGlobal Dossier 26.07.2017B2
JP2015510122 02.04.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL284506Global Dossier 01.06.2022B
IL284506 31.08.2021A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL254095Global Dossier 29.07.2021B
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IL233998Global Dossier 31.08.2017A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3882633Global Dossier 22.09.2021A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
EP18162713 08.02.2013
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
EP13703112 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP3367099Global Dossier 26.05.2021B1
EP3367099 29.08.2018A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
EP13703112 08.02.2013
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN108802385BGlobal Dossier 08.02.2022B
CN108802385 13.11.2018A
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
CN201380019055 08.02.2013
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CN104204803BGlobal Dossier 07.08.2018B
CN104204803 10.12.2014A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA3133249Global Dossier 25.07.2023C
CA3133249 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
CA2863819 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
CA2863819Global Dossier 23.11.2021C
CA2863819 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2018202302CGlobal Dossier 11.06.2020C1
AU2018202302B 23.01.2020B2
AU2018202302 26.04.2018A1
Priority number Date
AU2018202302 29.03.2018
AU2013217935 08.02.2013
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261652631 29.05.2012
US201261596950 09.02.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
AU2013217935BGlobal Dossier 17.05.2018B2
AU2013217935 04.09.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2812700Global Dossier 18.04.2018B1
EP2812700 17.12.2014A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
BR112014019733 13.09.2022B1
BR112014019733 22.08.2017A2
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ES2679107T 22.08.2018T3
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
HK1204065 06.11.2015A1
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
IN1780MUMNP2014 03.07.2015A
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
ZA201405993 25.11.2015B
Priority number Date
WO2013EP52619 08.02.2013
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2013117746Global Dossier 15.08.2013A1
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP2020180975Global Dossier 05.11.2020A
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
JP6725456BGlobal Dossier 22.07.2020B2
JP2017198696 02.11.2017A
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
ES2886979T 21.12.2021T3
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
HK1253780 05.07.2019A1
Priority number Date
US201261596950 09.02.2012
US201261652631 29.05.2012
TypeType Divisional application
 EP3367099
 EP3882633