EP2802273 - IMPLANTABLE SHAPE-MEMORY OCCLUSION DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/47] | IMPLANTABLE SHAPE-MEMORY OCCLUSION DEVICES AND METHODS OF THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USE | ||
[2017/24] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2017/48] |
Former [2014/47] | For all designated states W. L. Gore & Associates, Inc. 555 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNCAN, Jeffrey, B. 551 Paper Mill Road Newark, DE 19711 / US | [2014/47] | Representative(s) | HGF Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/48] | HGF Limited Delta House 50 West Nile Street Glasgow G1 2NP / GB | ||
Former [2014/47] | Shanks, Andrew Marks & Clerk LLP Aurora 120 Bothwell Street Glasgow G2 7JS / GB | Application number, filing date | 13703182.9 | 11.01.2013 | [2017/48] | WO2013US21209 | Priority number, date | US201261586633P | 13.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261586633 P | US201313738733 | 10.01.2013 Original published format: US201313738733 | [2014/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013106694 | Date: | 18.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2802273 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2802273 | Date: | 29.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12 | [2014/47] | CPC: |
A61B17/1214 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12031 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12036 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1204 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12109 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12113 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/12145 (EP,CN,US);
A61B17/1215 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00778 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00858 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00867 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00871 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00884 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2017/00995 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/47] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMPLANTIERBARE FORMGEDÄCHTNIS-OKKLUSIONSVORICHTUNGEN | [2017/24] | English: | IMPLANTABLE SHAPE-MEMORY OCCLUSION DEVICES | [2017/24] | French: | DISPOSITIFS D'OCCLUSION IMPLANTABLES À MÉMOIRE DE FORME | [2017/24] |
Former [2014/47] | IMPLANTIERBARE FORMGEDÄCHTNIS-OKKLUSIONSVORICHTUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | ||
Former [2014/47] | IMPLANTABLE SHAPE-MEMORY OCCLUSION DEVICES AND METHODS OF THEIR MANUFACTURE AND USE | ||
Former [2014/47] | DISPOSITIFS D'OCCLUSION ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION | Entry into regional phase | 09.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/47] | 12.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.09.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 19.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17202458.0 / EP3323359 | EP20216245.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 30.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2013 | AL | 29.11.2017 | AT | 29.11.2017 | CY | 29.11.2017 | CZ | 29.11.2017 | DK | 29.11.2017 | EE | 29.11.2017 | FI | 29.11.2017 | HR | 29.11.2017 | LT | 29.11.2017 | LV | 29.11.2017 | MC | 29.11.2017 | MK | 29.11.2017 | NL | 29.11.2017 | PL | 29.11.2017 | PT | 29.11.2017 | RO | 29.11.2017 | RS | 29.11.2017 | SE | 29.11.2017 | SI | 29.11.2017 | SK | 29.11.2017 | SM | 29.11.2017 | TR | 29.11.2017 | LU | 11.01.2018 | MT | 11.01.2018 | BE | 31.01.2018 | CH | 31.01.2018 | LI | 31.01.2018 | BG | 28.02.2018 | NO | 28.02.2018 | GR | 01.03.2018 | IS | 29.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
MK | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
MT | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AT | 29.11.2017 | ||
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PT | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
MT | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
TR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
MT | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
MT | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
MC | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SI | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
CH | 31.01.2018 | ||
LI | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BE | 31.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2018 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RO | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
PL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
SM | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
CY | 29.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 29.11.2017 | ||
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
EE | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
SK | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
DK | 29.11.2017 | ||
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
NL | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 29.11.2017 | |
FI | 29.11.2017 | ||
HR | 29.11.2017 | ||
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
LV | 29.11.2017 | ||
RS | 29.11.2017 | ||
SE | 29.11.2017 | ||
BG | 28.02.2018 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | ||
GR | 01.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 29.11.2017 | |
LT | 29.11.2017 | ||
NO | 28.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2001003801 (STRECKER ERNST-PETER [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-12,14,16 * paragraphs [0015] , [0029] - [0030] - [0033] - [0034] - [0040] - [0041] - [0043] * * figures 13-15 * * claim 33 * [A] 42 [I] 6-8,15,17-19; | [XYI]WO0164112 (PRODESCO [US], et al) [X] 37,41,46 * figure 11 * * page 16, lines 3-6 * * page 12, lines 22-32 * * page 16, line 35 - page 17, line 3 * * page 4, lines 28-29 * [Y] 38,39 [I] 40; | [XI]US6702834 (BOYLAN JOHN F [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,37 * column 1, lines 8-24,29-31 * * column 4, lines 28-38 * * column 5, lines 2-4 * * column 7, line 32 - line 49 * * column 25, lines 8-30 * * figures 41-42 * * ePTFE; column 36, line 28 * [I] 6-8,40,41; | [Y]WO2005042081 (PEACOCK JAMES C III [US]) [Y] 38,39* paragraphs [0113] - [0114]; figures 5-6 *; | [X]US2006271086 (RAMZIPOOR KAMAL [US], et al) [X] 20-27,29-35 * figure 1 * * figure 11 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0009] , [0012] - [0014] - [0026] , [0029] , [0033] - [0038] - [0040] - [0041] - [0045] *; | [X]EP1733702 (NITINOL DEV CORP [US]) [X] 37,46 * figures 3,5b, 9 * * "polymeric membranes"; paragraph [0012] *; | [A]US2009018569 (DESAI RUPESH [US], et al) [A] 28,36 * paragraph [0022]; figures 5,13,18 *; | [XI]US2009297582 (MEYER STEVEN [US], et al) [X] 20,22-24,26,27 * paragraphs [0313] , [ 315] - [0316] - [0318] - [0321] * * figures 5,7,11-12 * [I] 21; | [XAI]WO2010115076 (ENDOSHAPE INC [US], et al) [X] 29,30,32,34 * paragraphs [0053] - [0054]; figures 4c,4d * [A] 1-19 [I] 33; | [AP]US2012226304 (RYAN CHELSEY ELIZABETH [US], et al) [AP] 1-19 * figure 2b * | by applicant | US3174851 | US3351463 | US3753700 | US3953566 | US4187390 | US5814405 | US2012064273 |