EP2801137 - BUSBAR SYSTEM ESPECIALLY FOR LONG VERTICAL PATHS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 06.08.2021 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.06.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2021 | Refusal of application | published on 08.09.2021 [2021/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/46] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALEFELDER, Frank Kurtsiefener Str. 13a 53819 Neunkirchen-Seelscheid / DE | 02 /
HAAR, Rainer Am Burggraben 44 53121 Bonn / DE | [2014/46] | Application number, filing date | 13704043.2 | 01.02.2013 | WO2013EP51990 | Priority number, date | DE201210202435 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012202435 | [2014/46] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013120703 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2801137 | Date: | 12.11.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H02G5/02, H02G5/06, F03D11/00, H02G3/04 | [2014/46] | CPC: |
H02G5/06 (EP,US);
H02G5/025 (EP,US);
H02G3/0493 (EP,US);
Y02E10/72 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/46] | Title | German: | STROMSCHIENENSYSTEM SPEZIELL FÜR LANGE VERTIKALE STRECKEN | [2014/46] | English: | BUSBAR SYSTEM ESPECIALLY FOR LONG VERTICAL PATHS | [2014/46] | French: | SYSTÈME DE RAILS CONDUCTEURS SPÉCIALEMENT POUR DE LONGS TRONÇONS VERTICAUX | [2014/46] | Entry into regional phase | 08.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 10.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.06.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.12.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.12.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.05.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.09.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2021/36] | 02.05.2021 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2021/36] | Divisional application(s) | EP20208209.5 / EP3799238 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO03036084 (WOBBEN ALOYS [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 2 *; | [X]WO2005104320 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * figure 3 *; | [X]DE102008058129 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5 * figures 1,4 *; | [X]DE102009032619 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,2,5* figure 1B * | Examination | DE102010027498 |