EP2807050 - IMPROVED MOUNTING OF REAR SEAT BASES PROVIDED WITH A HOLDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2017 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PSA Peugeot Citroën Automobiles S.A. Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy Villacoublay / FR | [2016/20] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Route de Gisy 78140 Vélizy Villacoublay / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENOEUD, Jean Francois 5 Rue D'eupatoria 75020 Paris / FR | 02 /
LASSALLE, Olivier 51 Rue Sadi Carnot 92000 Nanterre / FR | 03 /
GUILBAUT, Marc 31 Rue Du President Kennedy 94140 Alfortville / FR | [2016/35] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
DENOEUD, Jean Francois 5 Rue D'eupatoria F-75020 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
LASSALLE, Olivier 51 Rue Sadi Carnot F-92000 Nanterre / FR | |||
03 /
GUILBAUT, Marc 31 Rue Du President Kennedy F-94140 Alfortville / FR | Representative(s) | Fosse, Danièle PSA Automobiles SA VPIB - LG081 18 rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Fosse, Danièle Peugeot Citroën Automobiles SA Propriété Industrielle - LG081 18, rue des Fauvelles 92250 La Garenne Colombes / FR | Application number, filing date | 13704154.7 | 11.01.2013 | [2016/35] | WO2013FR50073 | Priority number, date | FR20120050655 | 24.01.2012 Original published format: FR 1250655 | [2014/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013110874 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807050 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2807050 | Date: | 31.08.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/42, B60N2/015 | [2016/17] | CPC: |
B60N2/0155 (EP);
B60N2/4263 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/49] | B60N2/015 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTE BEFESTIGUNG FÜR RÜCKSITZRAHMEN MIT EINEM HALTESYSTEM | [2014/49] | English: | IMPROVED MOUNTING OF REAR SEAT BASES PROVIDED WITH A HOLDING SYSTEM | [2014/49] | French: | AMÉLIORATION DU MONTAGE DES ASSISES DE RANG 2 POURVU D'UN SYSTEME DE RETENUE | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 19.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.07.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.07.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.07.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.04.2016 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2013 | AL | 31.08.2016 | AT | 31.08.2016 | CY | 31.08.2016 | CZ | 31.08.2016 | DK | 31.08.2016 | EE | 31.08.2016 | FI | 31.08.2016 | HR | 31.08.2016 | IT | 31.08.2016 | LT | 31.08.2016 | LV | 31.08.2016 | MC | 31.08.2016 | MK | 31.08.2016 | MT | 31.08.2016 | NL | 31.08.2016 | PL | 31.08.2016 | RO | 31.08.2016 | RS | 31.08.2016 | SE | 31.08.2016 | SI | 31.08.2016 | SK | 31.08.2016 | SM | 31.08.2016 | TR | 31.08.2016 | BG | 30.11.2016 | NO | 30.11.2016 | GR | 01.12.2016 | IS | 31.12.2016 | PT | 02.01.2017 | IE | 11.01.2017 | LU | 11.01.2017 | BE | 31.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
TR | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MK | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
CY | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.01.2013 | |
AL | 31.08.2016 | ||
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 31.08.2016 | |
AT | 31.08.2016 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
MT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
MC | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SI | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/32] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
CZ | 31.08.2016 | ||
DK | 31.08.2016 | ||
EE | 31.08.2016 | ||
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
IT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
PL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RO | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
SK | 31.08.2016 | ||
SM | 31.08.2016 | ||
BG | 30.11.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
PT | 02.01.2017 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
LV | 31.08.2016 | ||
NL | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 31.08.2016 | |
FI | 31.08.2016 | ||
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
GR | 01.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
HR | 31.08.2016 | ||
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
RS | 31.08.2016 | ||
SE | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 31.08.2016 | |
LT | 31.08.2016 | ||
NO | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 31.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP2123505 (TOYOTA BOSHOKU KK [JP], et al) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1795392 (YAZAKI CORP [JP]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2789621 |