|
09.10.2018 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
26.06.2018 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.05.2018 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2018 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2018 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
22.01.2018 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.01.2018 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.07.2017 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
29.05.2017 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2017 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2017 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.01.2017 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.10.2016 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.05.2016 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.12.2015 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.11.2015 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.02.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2014 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.09.2014 |
Communication regarding comments on written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.09.2014 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.09.2014 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2014 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.08.2014 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Annexes to the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
04.08.2014 |
Copy of the international preliminary examination report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.06.2014 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.05.2014 |
Republication of front page of international application with corrected bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2014 |
Notification of election of EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.12.2013 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.12.2013 |
International publication of the international search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
31.10.2013 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
165 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
61 |
|
20.08.2013 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
72 |
|
01.08.2013 |
Published international application - A2 |
Search / examination |
184 |