EP2807850 - DYNAMIC PARAMETER ADJUSTMENT FOR LTE COEXISTENCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 25.06.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway, Suite 300 Wilmington, 19809 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | For all designated states Interdigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALA, Erdem 150 Secatogue Avenue 12B Farmingdale, NY 11735 / US | 02 /
BELURI, Mihaela, C. 44 Middle Lane Jericho, NY 11753 / US | 03 /
PURKAYASTHA, Debashish 1200 East Autumn Court Collegeville, PA 19426 / US | 04 /
LAUGHLIN, Scott 152 Ballantyne North Montreal, Quebec H4X 2C1 / CA | 05 /
FREDA, Martino 7131 Du Cabernet Laval, Quebec H7A 0A8 / CA | 06 /
DI GIROLAMO, Rocco 632 De Fribourg Street Laval, QC H7K 3Y3 / CA | 07 /
GAUVREAU, Jean-louis 115 Paradis La Prairie, QC J5R 6G7 / CA | 08 /
TOUAG, Athmane 752 Olivar-asselin Chomedey Laval, Quebec H7V 1V3 / CA | 09 /
MURRAY, Joseph, M. 12 Ashley Drive Schwenksville, PA 19473 / US | 10 /
BASS, David, S. 161 Schenck Avenue Great Neck, NY 11021 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Badel, Xavier Claude Yves Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 13704301.4 | 28.01.2013 | WO2013US23381 | Priority number, date | US201261591250P | 26.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591250 P | US201261603434P | 27.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261603434 P | US201261614469P | 22.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261614469 P | US201261687947P | 04.05.2012 Original published format: US 201261687947 P | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013112983 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2807850 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W16/14, H04W72/12 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
H04W16/14 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04J3/1694 (US);
H04W52/38 (EP,KR,US);
H04W72/1215 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE PARAMETEREINSTELLUNG FÜR LTE-KOEXISTENZ | [2014/49] | English: | DYNAMIC PARAMETER ADJUSTMENT FOR LTE COEXISTENCE | [2014/49] | French: | RÉGLAGE DE PARAMÈTRES DYNAMIQUE POUR COEXISTANCE DE LTE | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 22.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2014 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 22.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 19.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.06.2018 | 01.06.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 26.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/46] | 06.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2011205986 (MEDAPALLI KAMESWARA RAO [US]); | [X]US2011243047 (DAYAL PRANAV [US], et al); | [X]WO2011123531 (QUALCOMM INC [US], et al) |