EP2817589 - INCLINOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | For all designated states Université de Montpellier 163, rue Auguste Broussonnet 34090 Montpellier / FR | [2017/52] |
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Montpellier 2 Sciences et Techniques Place Eugène Bataillon 34095 Montpellier Cedex 5 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHERY, Jean 409 round du biou F-34980 St Clément de Rivière / FR | 02 /
COLLARD, Philippe 76 rue des Cétoines F-34090 Montpellier / FR | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Ipside 6, Impasse Michel Labrousse 31100 Toulouse / FR | [2017/45] |
Former [2015/01] | Pavageau, Sabrina Schmit-Chrétien SAS Parc de Basso Cambo West Park 4, rue Paul Mesplé 31100 Toulouse / FR | Application number, filing date | 13704615.7 | 19.02.2013 | [2017/45] | WO2013EP53251 | Priority number, date | FR20120051622 | 22.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251622 | [2015/01] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124261 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817589 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817589 | Date: | 08.11.2017 | Language: | FR | [2017/45] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2817589 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01C9/06, G01C9/14, G01V1/00 | [2015/01] | CPC: |
G01C9/14 (EP,US);
G01C9/06 (EP,US);
G01V1/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NEIGUNGSMESSER | [2015/01] | English: | INCLINOMETER | [2015/01] | French: | INCLINOMÈTRE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 29.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 29.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2017 | Opposition(s) | 09.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   30.04.2015 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.02.2013 | AL | 08.11.2017 | AT | 08.11.2017 | CY | 08.11.2017 | CZ | 08.11.2017 | DK | 08.11.2017 | EE | 08.11.2017 | ES | 08.11.2017 | FI | 08.11.2017 | HR | 08.11.2017 | LT | 08.11.2017 | LV | 08.11.2017 | MC | 08.11.2017 | MK | 08.11.2017 | MT | 08.11.2017 | NL | 08.11.2017 | PL | 08.11.2017 | PT | 08.11.2017 | RO | 08.11.2017 | RS | 08.11.2017 | SE | 08.11.2017 | SI | 08.11.2017 | SK | 08.11.2017 | SM | 08.11.2017 | TR | 08.11.2017 | BG | 08.02.2018 | GR | 09.02.2018 | IE | 19.02.2018 | LU | 19.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | IS | 08.03.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 19.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MK | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 19.02.2013 | |
AT | 08.11.2017 | ||
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PT | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
TR | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IE | 19.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SI | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
LU | 19.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MC | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
MT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RO | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
PL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
SM | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
CY | 08.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 08.11.2017 | ||
DK | 08.11.2017 | ||
EE | 08.11.2017 | ||
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
SK | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 08.11.2017 | |
ES | 08.11.2017 | ||
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
HR | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
LV | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | ||
RS | 08.11.2017 | ||
SE | 08.11.2017 | ||
BG | 08.02.2018 | ||
GR | 09.02.2018 | ||
IS | 08.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 08.11.2017 | |
FI | 08.11.2017 | ||
LT | 08.11.2017 | ||
NL | 08.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4949467 (OMAN ROBERT [CA], et al) [I] 1-5,7,8 * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 49; figures 1-4 * * column 4, lines 41-64 *; | [I]WO9010193 (STEWEAG [AT]) [I] 1-5,7,8* page 6, line 22 - page 8, line 6; figures 1,2 *; | [I]US2005007125 (HEGER CHARLES E [US]) [I] 1-5,7,8 * paragraphs [0021] , [0042] , [0043] , [0048]; figures 1B, 4D * | by applicant | FR1056230 |