Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9441964 | Global Dossier | 13.09.2016 | B2 | US2015040412 | 12.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251622 | 22.02.2012 | WO2013EP53251 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2817589 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2018 | B8 | EP2817589 | 08.11.2017 | B1 | EP2817589 | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251622 | 22.02.2012 | WO2013EP53251 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO2817589T | 07.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | FR1251622 | 22.02.2012 | WO2013EP53251 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013124261 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251622 | 22.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2987110 | 14.03.2014 | B1 | FR2987110 | 23.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251622 | 22.02.2012 |