EP2807646 - BUFFER MANAGEMENT FOR GRAPHICS PARALLEL PROCESSING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 28.08.2020 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM INCORPORATED International IP Administration 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2014/49] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOURD, Alexei V. 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121 / US | 02 /
GOEL, Vineet 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, 92121 / US | [2014/49] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/49] | Howe, Steven, et al Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13704848.4 | 24.01.2013 | WO2013US22900 | Priority number, date | US201261591733P | 27.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261591733 P | US201313747947 | 23.01.2013 Original published format: US201313747947 | [2014/49] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013112692 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2807646 | Date: | 03.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G09G5/36, G06F9/52, G06F9/50, G06G5/00 | [2014/49] | CPC: |
G09G5/001 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/20 (EP,KR,US);
G06T1/60 (KR,US);
G06F15/167 (KR);
G06F9/38 (KR);
G06F9/4881 (KR);
G06F9/50 (KR);
G06F9/5038 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/52 (EP,KR,US);
G06F9/544 (EP,KR,US);
G06G5/00 (KR);
G06T15/00 (KR);
G09G5/36 (KR);
G09G5/363 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2360/10 (EP,KR,US);
G09G2360/121 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/49] | Title | German: | PUFFERVERWALTUNG FÜR PARALLELE GRAFIKVERARBEITUNGSEINHEIT | [2014/49] | English: | BUFFER MANAGEMENT FOR GRAPHICS PARALLEL PROCESSING UNIT | [2014/49] | French: | GESTION DE MÉMOIRE POUR UNE UNITÉ DE TRAITEMENT EN PARALLÈLE DE DONNÉES GRAPHIQUES | [2014/49] | Entry into regional phase | 02.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 02.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 02.07.2014 | Examination requested [2014/49] | 19.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.03.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/40] | 04.03.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.05.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 12.05.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.07.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 09.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US5742785 (STONE HAROLD STUART [US], et al) [I] 1-23 * column 8, line 28 - column 10, line 55; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US7117481 (AGESEN OLE [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 63; figure 1 * * column 7, line 19 - column 8, line 18 * * column 11, line 14 - column 20, line 50; figures 1,2 *; | [I]EP1944735 (SONY COMPUTER ENTERTAINMENT INC [JP]) [I] 1-23 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0006] * * paragraph [0011] - paragraph [0033]; figures 1,2 * * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0069]; figures 5-7 *; | [A]US2010250809 (RAMESH ANANTHAKRISHNA [US], et al) [A] 1,11,22,23 * paragraph [0040] - paragraph [0046]; figures 1,2 *; | [I]WO2011012157 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE], et al) [I] 1,11,22,23 * page 6, line 11 - page 16, line 32; figures 1-12 *; | [A]US8087029 (LINDHOLM JOHN ERIK [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 5, line 19 - column 18, line 11; figures 1-5 *; | [A] - Averlogic Technologies Inc, "AL440B Data Sheets Version 1.0", (20011128), URL: http://www.datasheetcatalog.org/datasheets2/68/689127_1.pdf, XP002694833 [A] 1,11,22,23 | [A] - Averlogic Technologies Inc, "AverLogic Video FIFO Selection Guide", (20090116), URL: http://www.averlogic.com/pdf/Video_FIFO_Selection_Guide_20090116.pdf, XP002694834 [A] 1,11,22,23 | Examination | US2011102448 | US2012017062 |