EP2805223 - INTELLIGENT NAVIGATION OF A CATEGORY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.07.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.08.2016 [2016/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alibaba Group Holding Limited Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town Grand Cayman / KY | [2014/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Anxiang C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/f Building A The West Lake International Plaza of & S&T No.391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou / CN | 02 /
PAN, Chunxiang C/o Alibaba Group Legal Department 10/f Building A The West Lake International Plaza of & S&T No.391 Wen'er Road Hangzhou / CN | [2014/48] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/48] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol WP Thompson 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13705285.8 | 14.01.2013 | WO2013US21373 | Priority number, date | CN2012118295 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: CN201210018295 | US201313739840 | 11.01.2013 Original published format: US201313739840 | [2014/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013109489 | Date: | 25.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2805223 | Date: | 26.11.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.07.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.12.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2015/36] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0603 (EP,US);
G06F16/3322 (US)
|
Former IPC [2014/48] | G06F3/048 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/48] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE NAVIGATION EINES KATEGORIESYSTEMS | [2014/48] | English: | INTELLIGENT NAVIGATION OF A CATEGORY SYSTEM | [2014/48] | French: | NAVIGATION INTELLIGENTE DANS UN SYSTÈME DE CATÉGORIES | [2014/48] | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Search fee paid | 04.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/48] | 01.03.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/34] | 08.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2003050916 (ORTEGA RUBEN E [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0094] * * figure 2 *; | [I]US2005222987 (VADON ERIC R [US]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0084] * * figures 1, 4 *; | [A]US7647309 (BAR TAMAR [US]) [A] 1-15 * abstract * * column 1, line 36 - column 13, line 9 ** figure 8 * | International search | [A]US2009044150 (LIU AGNES [US], et al); | [X]US2011307839 (LIAO JIAN [CN], et al) |