10.12.2021 |
Patent maintained (B2 publication) |
published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] |
17.11.2021 |
New entry: Fee for printing new specification paid |
|
01.09.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended |
|
20.08.2021 |
New entry: Legal effect of interlocutory decision |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision |
|
12.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2020 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2020 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2020 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
20.03.2020 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.03.2020 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
06.03.2020 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
25.02.2020 |
New entry: Reply to examination report in opposition |
|
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
12.12.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report in opposition + time limit |
|
10.12.2019 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
28.06.2019 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.06.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.06.2019 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
14.06.2019 |
Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
28.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] |
25.09.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2018 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2018 |
Deletion: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
11.09.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
23.07.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
29.05.2018 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
23.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] |
09.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.03.2018 [2018/11] |
02.02.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.03.2018 [2018/10] |
26.01.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.02.2018 [2018/09] |
17.01.2018 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
12.01.2018 |
Opposition filed |
published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] |
01.12.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] |
24.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.12.2017 [2017/52] |
17.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.12.2017 [2017/51] |
10.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.12.2017 [2017/50] |
03.11.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.12.2017 [2017/49] |
03.03.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 05.04.2017 [2017/14] |
25.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Information about intention to grant a patent |
|
11.01.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.12.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.12.2016 |
Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO |
|
07.12.2016 |
Deletion: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
05.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.12.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.07.2016 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
24.06.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.07.2016 [2016/30] |
09.03.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.10.2015 |
First examination report |
|
24.07.2015 |
Change - applicant |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
24.04.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
03.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.11.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
15.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.09.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
19.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
06.02.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|