EP2817382 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ALKOXYLATED AMINE COMPOUND AND A CARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOUND, USE THEREOF IN WATER IN OLL EMULSIONS AND PROCESS USING THE COMPOSITION AS OR AS PART OF A DRILLING FLUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 10.12.2021 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.2021 | Patent maintained (B2 publication) | published on 12.01.2022 [2022/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sasol Performance Chemicals GmbH Anckelmannsplatz 1 20537 Hamburg / DE | [2022/02] |
Former [2015/35] | For all designated states Sasol Performance Chemicals GmbH Anckelmannsplatz 1 20537 Hamburg / DE | ||
Former [2015/01] | For all designated states Sasol Olefins & Surfactants GmbH Anckelmannsplatz 1 20537 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAPIERALA, Heinz Distelkamp 22 45699 Herten / DE | 02 /
BÖSING, Ludger Heidbruch25 43286 Dorsten / DE | [2015/01] | Representative(s) | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB (Muc) Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/01] | Müller Schupfner & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Schellerdamm 19 21079 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13705396.3 | 20.02.2013 | [2017/14] | WO2013EP00487 | Priority number, date | DE20121003224 | 20.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012003224 | [2015/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013124058 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2817382 | Date: | 31.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2817382 | Date: | 05.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/14] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2817382 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/36 | [2016/30] | CPC: |
C09K8/36 (EP,CN,RU,US);
C09K8/28 (EP,CN,US);
C10G1/04 (EP,US);
E21B21/012 (US);
E21B21/065 (US);
C09K8/035 (RU);
E21B21/14 (RU)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/01] | C09K8/035, C09K8/36, C09K8/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER ALKOXYLIERTEN AMINVERBINDUNG UND EINER CARBONSÄUREVERBINDUNG, VERWENDUNG DAVON IN WASSER-IN-ÖL-EMULSIONEN SOWIE VERFAHREN UNTER VERWENDUNG DER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ALS BOHRFLÜSSIGKEIT ODER ALS TEIL DAVON | [2015/01] | English: | COMPOSITION COMPRISING AN ALKOXYLATED AMINE COMPOUND AND A CARBOXYLIC ACID COMPOUND, USE THEREOF IN WATER IN OLL EMULSIONS AND PROCESS USING THE COMPOSITION AS OR AS PART OF A DRILLING FLUID | [2015/01] | French: | COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN COMPOSÉ AMINE ALCOXYLÉ ET UN COMPOSÉ ACIDE CARBOXYLIQUE, UTILISATION DE CELLE-CI DANS DES ÉMULSIONS EAU DANS HUILE, ET PROCÉDÉ COMPRENANT L'UTILISATION DE LADITE COMPOSITION COMME FLUIDE DE FORAGE OU COMME CONSTITUANT D'UN FLUIDE DE FORAGE | [2015/01] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/01] | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.11.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 29.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.01.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 11.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
03.01.2018
ADMISSIBLE Pajaro Limited 12 New Fetter Lane London EC4A 1JP / GB Opponent's representative Kinkeldey, Daniela, et al, et al Bird & Bird LLP Maximiliansplatz 22 80333 München / DE | [2018/07] | 18.01.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.05.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 10.12.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 13.01.2020 | 13.12.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.02.2020 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 23.03.2021 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 23.03.2021 | Date of oral proceedings | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 11.05.2021 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 16.11.2021 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.02.2013 | AL | 05.04.2017 | AT | 05.04.2017 | CY | 05.04.2017 | CZ | 05.04.2017 | EE | 05.04.2017 | FI | 05.04.2017 | HR | 05.04.2017 | LT | 05.04.2017 | LV | 05.04.2017 | MC | 05.04.2017 | MK | 05.04.2017 | PL | 05.04.2017 | PT | 05.04.2017 | RS | 05.04.2017 | SE | 05.04.2017 | SI | 05.04.2017 | SK | 05.04.2017 | SM | 05.04.2017 | BG | 05.07.2017 | GR | 06.07.2017 | IS | 05.08.2017 | IE | 20.02.2018 | LU | 20.02.2018 | MT | 20.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | CH | 28.02.2018 | LI | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CY | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
MK | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 20.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
MT | 20.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 20.02.2013 | |
AT | 05.04.2017 | ||
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
PT | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 20.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
MT | 20.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 20.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
MT | 20.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 20.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
IE | 20.02.2018 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
LU | 20.02.2018 | ||
CH | 28.02.2018 | ||
LI | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
MC | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SI | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
SM | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
CZ | 05.04.2017 | ||
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
SK | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
EE | 05.04.2017 | ||
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
LV | 05.04.2017 | ||
PL | 05.04.2017 | ||
RS | 05.04.2017 | ||
SE | 05.04.2017 | ||
BG | 05.07.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 05.04.2017 | |
FI | 05.04.2017 | ||
HR | 05.04.2017 | ||
LT | 05.04.2017 | ||
GR | 06.07.2017 | ||
IS | 05.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US3125517 (RONALD L. VODA) [X] 1,2,4,9,14,16,17,22-25 * column 2, line 15 - line 42 * * column 3, line 30 - line 60 * * claims * [I] 1-25; | [AD]WO9805733 (MI DRILLING FLUIDS LLC [US]) [AD] 1-25 * claims *; | [A]CA2047697 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [A] 1-25 * claims *; | [A]DE102006003201 (BASF CONSTR POLYMERS GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-25* claims * | by applicant | WO9805733 | Opposition | WO9805733 | WO0100758 | EP0946669 | US2007049500 | WO2008089858 | US2011011645 | DE102012003224 | WO2013124058 | EP0946669 |