EP2879768 - PROCESS FOR ORAL CARE MATERIAL TASTE AND/OR ODOR IMPROVEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.09.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.12.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.10.2021 [2021/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HOKE, Steven, Hamilton, II 8044 West Gate Park West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 02 /
HAUGHT, John, Christian 8240 Twin Cove Court West Chester, Ohio 45069 / US | 03 /
LEI, Qingxin 7453 Cedarcrest Drive Liberty Township, Ohio 45044-8716 / US | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | P&G Patent Germany Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Sulzbacher Straße 40 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Joos, Uta Susanne P&G Service GmbH Frankfurter Straße 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13705652.9 | 01.02.2013 | WO2013US24357 | Priority number, date | US201261678942P | 02.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261678942 P | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2014021933 | Date: | 06.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/06] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2879768 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.12.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B01D11/02, A61K8/25, A61K8/37, A61K8/60, A61Q11/00, A61K8/91, A61K8/02, A61K8/21, A61K8/55 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
A61K8/21 (EP,US);
A61K8/8147 (US);
A61K31/075 (EP,US);
A61K31/11 (EP,US);
A61K31/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/13 (EP,US);
A61K31/16 (EP,US);
A61K8/0216 (EP,US);
A61K8/18 (US);
A61K8/24 (US);
A61K8/25 (EP,US);
A61K8/31 (US);
A61K8/37 (EP,US);
A61K8/55 (EP,US);
A61K8/58 (US);
A61K8/60 (EP,US);
A61K8/91 (EP,US);
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERBESSERUNG DES GESCHMACKS UND/ODER GERUCHS EINES MUNDPFLEGESTOFFES | [2015/24] | English: | PROCESS FOR ORAL CARE MATERIAL TASTE AND/OR ODOR IMPROVEMENT | [2015/24] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'AMÉLIORATION DU GOÛT ET/OU DE L'ODEUR D'UNE SUBSTANCE POUR L'HYGIÈNE BUCCALE | [2015/24] | Entry into regional phase | 04.02.2015 | National basic fee paid | 04.02.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.02.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 30.09.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/42] | 16.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/42] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.01.2021 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.2015 | 28.02.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US3988344 (NAKAOJI KOZO) [I] 1-14* claim 1 *; | [X]US4818533 (BOULWARE RICHARD T [US], et al) [X] 1,3 * column 1, line 51 - line 59; figure 1 *; | [X]WO02092028 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US]) [X] 1,15 * page 12, line 27 - page 13, line 4 * | Examination | WO2013019955 | by applicant | US4352829 | WO2008005550 |