EP2812665 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE WAVEFRONT OF AN OPHTHALMIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.07.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care, Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | [2019/47] |
Former [2014/51] | For all designated states Johnson & Johnson Vision Care Inc. 7500 Centurion Parkway Jacksonville, FL 32256 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WIDMAN, Michael F. 2864 Claire Lane Jacksonville, Florida 32223 / US | 02 /
AGARWAL, Naveen 5869 Alamosa Circle Jacksonville, Florida 32258 / US | [2014/51] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2014/51] | Application number, filing date | 13705679.2 | 07.02.2013 | [2019/47] | WO2013US25077 | Priority number, date | US201261597338P | 10.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261597338 P | [2014/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013119764 | Date: | 15.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2812665 | Date: | 17.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2812665 | Date: | 20.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01M11/02 | [2014/51] | CPC: |
G01M11/02 (EP,RU,US);
G01N21/41 (RU,US);
G01B9/00 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG DAS WELLENFRONT EINER OPHTHALMISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2019/32] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING THE WAVEFRONT OF AN OPHTHALMIC DEVICE | [2014/51] | French: | MÉTHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR MESURER LE FRONT D'ONDE D'UN DISPOSITIF OPHTALMIQUE | [2019/32] |
Former [2014/51] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR WELLENFRONTVERMESSUNG EINER OPHTHALMISCHEN VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2014/51] | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MESURER LE FRONT D'ONDE D'UN DISPOSITIF OPHTALMIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 09.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 09.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/51] | 07.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.07.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.02.2018 | Opposition(s) | 21.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.02.2013 | AL | 20.11.2019 | AT | 20.11.2019 | CY | 20.11.2019 | CZ | 20.11.2019 | DK | 20.11.2019 | EE | 20.11.2019 | ES | 20.11.2019 | FI | 20.11.2019 | HR | 20.11.2019 | LT | 20.11.2019 | LV | 20.11.2019 | MC | 20.11.2019 | MK | 20.11.2019 | MT | 20.11.2019 | NL | 20.11.2019 | PL | 20.11.2019 | RO | 20.11.2019 | RS | 20.11.2019 | SE | 20.11.2019 | SI | 20.11.2019 | SK | 20.11.2019 | SM | 20.11.2019 | TR | 20.11.2019 | LU | 07.02.2020 | BG | 20.02.2020 | NO | 20.02.2020 | GR | 21.02.2020 | BE | 29.02.2020 | CH | 29.02.2020 | LI | 29.02.2020 | IS | 20.03.2020 | PT | 12.04.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 07.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.11.2019 | ||
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CY | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
MT | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
TR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2021/12] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
BE | 29.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
AT | 20.11.2019 | ||
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
PL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SI | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
CH | 29.02.2020 | ||
LI | 29.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
MC | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
LU | 07.02.2020 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
SK | 20.11.2019 | ||
SM | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
DK | 20.11.2019 | ||
EE | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
PT | 12.04.2020 | ||
Former [2020/35] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
CZ | 20.11.2019 | ||
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RO | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/32] | AL | 20.11.2019 | |
ES | 20.11.2019 | ||
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/26] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
HR | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
RS | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/24] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
IS | 20.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | ES | 20.11.2019 | |
FI | 20.11.2019 | ||
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
LV | 20.11.2019 | ||
NL | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
GR | 21.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | FI | 20.11.2019 | |
LT | 20.11.2019 | ||
SE | 20.11.2019 | ||
BG | 20.02.2020 | ||
NO | 20.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/21] | NO | 20.02.2020 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2004190428 (ITO TAKASHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract ** paragraphs [0012] - [0027] - [0069] - [0071] *; | [XDI]WO2009025848 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON VISION CARE [US], et al) [XD] 1,5,10,17,20,24 * abstract * * page 32, line 5 - page 33, paragraph 16 * [I] 2-4,6-9,11,15,16,18,19,21-23 | by applicant | WO2009025848 | WO2009025845 |