EP2814490 - INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS REPLICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.08.2018 Database last updated on 26.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare UK (No.5) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2016/43] | For all designated states VIIV Healthcare UK (No.5) Limited 980 Great West Road Brentford Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2014/52] | For all designated states Bristol-Myers Squibb Company Route 206 and Province Line Road Princeton, NJ 08543 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WALKER, Michael, A. c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 02 /
SORENSON, Margaret, E. 16 Collins Parkway Meriden, CT 06450 / US | 03 /
NAIDU, B., Narasimhulu c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 04 /
PEESE, Kevin c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 05 /
JOHNSON, Barry, L. 21 Wooding Road Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | 06 /
PATEL, Manoj c/o Bristol-Myers Squibb Company 5 Research Parkway Wallingford, Connecticut 06492 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Learoyd, Stephanie Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [2017/42] |
Former [2014/52] | Vögeli-Lange, Regina, et al Swords Laboratories Swiss Branch, Steinhausen Hinterbergstrasse 16 6330 Cham / CH | Application number, filing date | 13705712.1 | 14.02.2013 | [2017/42] | WO2013US26082 | Priority number, date | US201261599102P | 15.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261599102 P | US201313766587 | 13.02.2013 Original published format: US201313766587 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123148 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814490 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814490 | Date: | 18.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/4375, C07D471/04, A61P31/18 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
C07D471/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/4375 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HIV REPLIKATIONSINHIBITOREN FÜR MENSCHEN | [2017/33] | English: | INHIBITORS OF HUMAN IMMUNODEFICIENCY VIRUS REPLICATION | [2014/52] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE RÉPLICATION DU VIRUS DE L'IMMUNODÉFICIENCE HUMAINE | [2014/52] |
Former [2014/52] | HEMMER DER NEUBILDUNG MENSCHLICHER IMMUNDEFEKT-VIREN | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 25.11.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.08.2017 | Opposition(s) | 19.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.02.2013 | AL | 18.10.2017 | AT | 18.10.2017 | CY | 18.10.2017 | CZ | 18.10.2017 | DK | 18.10.2017 | EE | 18.10.2017 | FI | 18.10.2017 | HR | 18.10.2017 | LT | 18.10.2017 | LV | 18.10.2017 | MC | 18.10.2017 | MK | 18.10.2017 | PL | 18.10.2017 | RO | 18.10.2017 | RS | 18.10.2017 | SI | 18.10.2017 | SK | 18.10.2017 | SM | 18.10.2017 | TR | 18.10.2017 | BG | 18.01.2018 | NO | 18.01.2018 | GR | 19.01.2018 | IE | 14.02.2018 | LU | 14.02.2018 | MT | 14.02.2018 | IS | 18.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 14.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CY | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
MK | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 14.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
TR | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
MT | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IE | 14.02.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SI | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
LU | 14.02.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
MC | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RO | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
PL | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
SM | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
CZ | 18.10.2017 | ||
DK | 18.10.2017 | ||
EE | 18.10.2017 | ||
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
SK | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 18.10.2017 | |
FI | 18.10.2017 | ||
HR | 18.10.2017 | ||
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
LV | 18.10.2017 | ||
RS | 18.10.2017 | ||
BG | 18.01.2018 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | ||
GR | 19.01.2018 | ||
IS | 18.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | FI | 18.10.2017 | |
LT | 18.10.2017 | ||
NO | 18.01.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9915526 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-15* claims 1-10 *; | [A]WO2009062289 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-50; table 1 *; | [A]WO2009062308 (BOEHRINGER INGELHEIM INT [DE], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-30; tables 1,2 * | by applicant | US2007249583 | WO2007131350 | WO2009062285 | WO2009062288 | WO2009062289 | WO2009062308 | - PALELLA, F. J.; DELANY, K. M.; MOORMAN, A. C.; LOVELESS, M. 0.; FURHER, J.; SATTEN, G. A.; ASCHMAN, D. J.; HOLMBERG, S. D. N., ENGL. J. MED., (1998), vol. 338, pages 853 - 860 | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (2008), page 4253 |