EP2825481 - CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR A WIDE-MOUTHED JAR, FOR CONTAINING A LIQUID OR PASTY MATERIAL AND COMBINED WITH A SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING AND DISPENSING WITHOUT TAKING IN AIR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.05.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Promens SA 5 Rue Castellion 01100 Bellignat / FR | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNEMANN, Pascal 866 route de la Vallée F-39360 Vaux Les Saint Claude / FR | 02 /
REYES SERRATO, Jesus Av Dr Pasteur 31 3-1r E-08700 Igualada / ES | 03 /
TOBIAS FRANCO, Jaume C/ Les Moreres 3 Esc 1 2°3a E-08780 Palleja / ES | [2015/04] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies 16, rue Gambetta 25000 Besançon / FR | [2015/04] | Application number, filing date | 13706641.1 | 06.02.2013 | [2016/29] | WO2013FR50249 | Priority number, date | FR20120052358 | 15.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252358 | [2015/04] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013153297 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825481 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825481 | Date: | 20.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/00, B05B11/00 | [2015/04] | CPC: |
B65D83/0055 (EP,US);
B65D25/16 (US);
B05B11/027 (EP,US);
B05B11/0032 (EP);
B05B11/0038 (EP);
B05B11/1032 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHÄLTER, INSBESONDERE GEFÄSS MIT GROSSER ÖFFNUNG, FÜR FLÜSSIGES ODER PASTÖSES MATERIAL UND KOMBINIERT MIT EINEM SYSTEM ZUR ENTNAHME UND AUSGABE OHNE LUFTEINLASS | [2015/47] | English: | CONTAINER, IN PARTICULAR A WIDE-MOUTHED JAR, FOR CONTAINING A LIQUID OR PASTY MATERIAL AND COMBINED WITH A SYSTEM FOR COLLECTING AND DISPENSING WITHOUT TAKING IN AIR | [2015/04] | French: | RÉCIPIENT, NOTAMMENT POT À GRANDE OUVERTURE, DESTINÉ À CONTENIR UN PRODUIT LIQUIDE OU PÂTEUX, ASSOCIÉ À UN SYSTÈME DE PRÉLÈVEMENT ET DE DISTRIBUTION SANS REPRISE D'AIR | [2015/04] |
Former [2015/04] | BEHÄLTER, INSBESONDERE MIT EIN GEFÄSS MIT GROSSER ÖFFNUNG, FÜR FLÜSSIGES ODER PASTÖSES MATERIAL UND KOMBINIERT MIT EINEM SYSTEM ZUR SAMMLUNG UND AUSGABE OHNE LUFTEINLASS | Entry into regional phase | 22.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 22.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 09.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.12.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 26.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 01.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 07.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 21.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.02.2013 | AL | 20.07.2016 | AT | 20.07.2016 | CY | 20.07.2016 | CZ | 20.07.2016 | DK | 20.07.2016 | EE | 20.07.2016 | FI | 20.07.2016 | GR | 20.07.2016 | HR | 20.07.2016 | LT | 20.07.2016 | LV | 20.07.2016 | MC | 20.07.2016 | MK | 20.07.2016 | MT | 20.07.2016 | NL | 20.07.2016 | PL | 20.07.2016 | RO | 20.07.2016 | RS | 20.07.2016 | SE | 20.07.2016 | SI | 20.07.2016 | SK | 20.07.2016 | SM | 20.07.2016 | TR | 20.07.2016 | BG | 20.10.2016 | NO | 20.10.2016 | IS | 20.11.2016 | PT | 21.11.2016 | IE | 06.02.2017 | LU | 06.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | [2020/30] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
TR | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MK | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CY | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.02.2013 | |
AL | 20.07.2016 | ||
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 20.07.2016 | |
AT | 20.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
MT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
IE | 06.02.2017 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
LU | 06.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/45] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
MC | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SI | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
CZ | 20.07.2016 | ||
DK | 20.07.2016 | ||
EE | 20.07.2016 | ||
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RO | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
SK | 20.07.2016 | ||
SM | 20.07.2016 | ||
BG | 20.10.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
LV | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 20.07.2016 | |
FI | 20.07.2016 | ||
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
PT | 21.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
HR | 20.07.2016 | ||
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
PL | 20.07.2016 | ||
RS | 20.07.2016 | ||
SE | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
IS | 20.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 20.07.2016 | |
LT | 20.07.2016 | ||
NL | 20.07.2016 | ||
NO | 20.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR811137 (EMILE PIQUEREZ) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [YD]GB2184491 (GORMAN DEREK HARCOURT) [YD] 1-3,5 * page 1, line 3 - line 110 * * figures 1-5 *; | [Y]WO2006107403 (FUN DAMENTAL TOO LTD [US], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 5, line 3 - page 7, line 5 * * figures 1-6, 9 * | by applicant | GB2184491 | EP0546898 |