EP2815339 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USER-SPECIFIC MODULATION OF NUTRIENT INTAKE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 20.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.12.2022 | Refusal of application | published on 11.01.2023 [2023/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Good Measures, LLC Sixty State Street Suite 700 Boston, MA 02109 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BENNETT, George, B. 280 Dudley Street Brookline, MA 02445 / US | 02 /
RIES, Daniel, R. 25 West Street Belmont, MA 02478 / US | 03 /
SHAHEEN, Stefany, A. 7 South Street Portsmouth, NH 03801 / US | 04 /
CHEN, Chesley, M. 196 Willams Road Concord, MA 01742 / US | 05 /
STONE, Emily, P. 34 Fayette Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 06 /
MATHEWS, Robert, V. 216 School Street Somerville, MA 02145 / US | [N/P] | Representative(s) | Larsen, Charles McDermott Will Emery LLC 22 Bishopsgate London EC2N 4BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Curran, Clair, et al Ropes & Gray International LLP 5 New Street Square London, Greater London, EC4A 3BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13706887.0 | 15.02.2013 | WO2013US26468 | Priority number, date | US201261600448P | 17.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261600448 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123416 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2815339 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
G16H20/30 (EP,US);
A61B5/4866 (US);
A61B5/7275 (US);
G09B19/0092 (US);
G09B5/00 (US);
G16H20/60 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR BENUTZERSPEZIFISCHEN MODULATION DER NÄHRSTOFFEINNAHME | [2014/52] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR USER-SPECIFIC MODULATION OF NUTRIENT INTAKE | [2014/52] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR MODULATION DE CONSOMMATION D'ÉLÉMENTS NUTRITIFS SPÉCIFIQUE À UN UTILISATEUR | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 24.07.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.06.2020 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 25.08.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 03.11.2020 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 17.08.2022 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2022 | 26.08.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2023/02] | 05.09.2022 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2023/02] | 16.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP22205653.3 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.07.2018 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 03.11.2020 | Request for further processing filed | 03.11.2020 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.11.2020 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 15.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 11.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |