EP2839112 - MONITORING FLOW CONDITIONS DOWNWELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.11.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OptaSense Holdings Limited Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GODFREY, Alastair c/o Cody Technology Park Ively Road Farnborough Hampshire GU14 0LX / GB | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Day, Caroline Margaret Haseltine Lake LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/09] | Day, Caroline Margaret Haseltine Lake LLP 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 13707429.0 | 25.02.2013 | [2017/03] | WO2013GB50455 | Priority number, date | GB20120003854 | 05.03.2012 Original published format: GB 201203854 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013132227 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2839112 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839112 | Date: | 18.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.07.2014 | Classification | IPC: | E21B47/10, E21B47/12 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
E21B47/10 (EP,GB,US);
E21B47/135 (EP,GB,US);
E21B47/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNG VON STRÖMUNGSBEDINGUNGEN IN ABWÄRTSRICHTUNG | [2015/09] | English: | MONITORING FLOW CONDITIONS DOWNWELL | [2015/09] | French: | SURVEILLANCE DES CONDITIONS D'ÉCOULEMENT EN FOND DE PUITS | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/09] | 11.11.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time [2015/09] | 26.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 22.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.05.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.09.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.09.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 08.09.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.12.2016 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 08.12.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.05.2016 | Opposition(s) | 19.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/52] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 26.11.2014 | Request for further processing filed | 26.11.2014 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 12.01.2015 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.02.2013 | AL | 18.01.2017 | AT | 18.01.2017 | CY | 18.01.2017 | CZ | 18.01.2017 | DK | 18.01.2017 | EE | 18.01.2017 | ES | 18.01.2017 | FI | 18.01.2017 | HR | 18.01.2017 | IT | 18.01.2017 | LT | 18.01.2017 | LV | 18.01.2017 | MC | 18.01.2017 | MK | 18.01.2017 | NL | 18.01.2017 | PL | 18.01.2017 | RO | 18.01.2017 | RS | 18.01.2017 | SE | 18.01.2017 | SI | 18.01.2017 | SK | 18.01.2017 | SM | 18.01.2017 | TR | 18.01.2017 | IE | 25.02.2017 | LU | 25.02.2017 | MT | 25.02.2017 | BE | 28.02.2017 | CH | 28.02.2017 | LI | 28.02.2017 | FR | 20.03.2017 | BG | 18.04.2017 | GR | 19.04.2017 | IS | 18.05.2017 | PT | 18.05.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
TR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
MK | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CY | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 25.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SI | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
FR | 20.03.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2018/04] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
LU | 25.02.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
SM | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
DK | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
MC | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
EE | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
IT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RO | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
SK | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
CH | 28.02.2017 | ||
LI | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
CZ | 18.01.2017 | ||
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
LV | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
RS | 18.01.2017 | ||
SE | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
BG | 18.04.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | ||
PT | 18.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 18.01.2017 | |
ES | 18.01.2017 | ||
FI | 18.01.2017 | ||
HR | 18.01.2017 | ||
LT | 18.01.2017 | ||
NL | 18.01.2017 | ||
PL | 18.01.2017 | ||
BE | 28.02.2017 | ||
GR | 19.04.2017 | ||
IS | 18.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XA]WO9850680 (BAKER HUGHES INC [US]) [X] 1,21 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraphs 2,3 *[A] 2-20,22-33; | [XA]US2011088462 (SAMSON ETIENNE M [US], et al) [X] 1,21 * abstract * * paragraphs [0025] , [0028] , [0055] , [0057] * * paragraphs [0033] , [0044] , [0035] * [A] 2-20,22-33; | [XI]EP2418466 (WEATHERFORD LAMB [US]) [X] 1-3,6-12,17-21,24,25,28-33 * abstract * * figures 1,2,9,11,12 * * paragraphs [0002] , [0004] , [0034] , [0037] * * paragraphs [0055] - [0057] * * paragraphs [0028] , [0045] * [I] 4,5,13-16,22,23,26,27 |