EP2822947 - ARGININE SALTS OF A TLR7 AGONIST [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/03] | IMMUNOLOGICALLY USEFUL ARGININE SALTS | ||
[2015/45] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.06.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GlaxoSmithKline Biologicals SA Rue de l'Institut 89 1330 Rixensart / BE | [2016/30] |
Former [2015/03] | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DODD, Stephanie Kay c/o Novartis Institutes for BioMedical Research Inc. 500 Technology Square Cambridge, Massachusetts 02139 / US | 02 /
JAIN, Siddartha c/o Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics Inc. IP Services X-100B 4560 Horton Street Emeryville, California 94608 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Furstoss, Olivia Aline, et al GSK W23-F3 20, avenue Fleming 1300 Wavre / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/31] | Furstoss, Olivia Aline, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex, TW8 9GS / GB | ||
Former [2015/03] | Courgeon, Antoine, et al Novartis Vaccines and Diagnostics S.r.l. Intellectual Property Via Fiorentina, 1 53100 Siena / IT | Application number, filing date | 13708142.8 | 07.03.2013 | [2016/31] | WO2013EP54548 | Priority number, date | US201261608011P | 07.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261608011 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013131985 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822947 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2822947 | Date: | 03.08.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D471/04, A61K39/39, C07F9/6561, A61P37/04, A61K31/675 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
C07F9/6561 (EP,CN,US);
A61K39/39 (EP,US);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61K2039/55511 (US);
Y02A50/30 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/03] | C07D471/04, A61K31/4375, A61P37/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARGININSALZE EINES TLR7 AGONISTEN | [2015/45] | English: | ARGININE SALTS OF A TLR7 AGONIST | [2015/45] | French: | SELS D'ARGININE D'UN AGONISTE DE TLR7 | [2015/45] |
Former [2015/03] | IMMUNOLOGISCH GEEIGNETE ARGININSALZE | ||
Former [2015/03] | IMMUNOLOGICALLY USEFUL ARGININE SALTS | ||
Former [2015/03] | SELS D'ARGININE UTILES DU POINT DE VUE IMMUNOLOGIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 02.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 04.05.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 03.08.2016 | MC | 03.08.2016 | MK | 03.08.2016 | RS | 03.08.2016 | SM | 03.08.2016 | [2019/51] |
Former [2018/46] | AL | 03.08.2016 | |
MC | 03.08.2016 | ||
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/01] | MC | 03.08.2016 | |
RS | 03.08.2016 | ||
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | RS | 03.08.2016 | |
SM | 03.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | RS | 03.08.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]WO2011027222 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [AD] 1-15 * paragraph [0164]; claim 12; compound 20 *; | [A]WO2011049677 (IRM LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0161]; claims 12-14; compound 20 *; | [E]WO2013030378 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [E] 1-15* p.37, l.10-22;; claim 24; compound K2 * | by applicant | WO9318150 | WO9527787 | WO9601272 | WO9601273 | WO9725429 | WO0037494 | WO0202606 | WO03010317 | WO03049762 | WO03097091 | US6699474 | WO2004032958 | WO2005002619 | WO2005084306 | WO2006089264 | WO2006091517 | WO2006138004 | WO2007060548 | WO2007110700 | WO2008020330 | WO2009050586 | WO2010119343 | WO2010140119 | WO2011024072 | WO2011027222 | - BURRELL ET AL., VACCINE, (1999), vol. 17, pages 2599 - 603 | - POWELL & NEWMAN., Vaccine Design, PLENUM | - TREANOR ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1996), vol. 173, pages 1467 - 70 | - KEITEL ET AL., CLIN DIAGN LAB IMMUNOL, (1996), vol. 3, pages 507 - 10 | - CASSONE; TOROSANTUCCI, EXPERT REV VACCINES, (2006), vol. 5, pages 859 - 67 | - GIULIANI ET AL., PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2006), vol. 103, pages 10834 - 9 | - COVACCI; RAPPUOLI, J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 19, pages 587 - 592 | - COVACCI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1993), vol. 90, pages 5791 - 5795 | - TUMMURU ET AL., INFECT. IMMUN., (1994), vol. 61, pages 1799 - 1809 | - MARCHETTI ET AL., VACCINE, (1998), vol. 16, pages 33 - 37 | - TELFORD ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (1994), vol. 179, pages 1653 - 1658 | - EVANS ET AL., GENE, (1995), vol. 153, pages 123 - 127 | - RAPPUOLI ET AL., TIBTECH, (1991), vol. 9, pages 232 - 238 | - NENCIONI ET AL., INFECT IMMUN., (1991), vol. 59, no. 2, pages 625 - 30 | - ZHANG ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 39577 - 85 | - EARL ET AL., J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, pages 645 - 53 | - BARNETT ET AL., J VIROL, (2001), vol. 75, pages 5526 - 40 | - MMWR MORB MORTAL WKLY REP, (19980116), vol. 47, no. 1, page 12,19 | - HARPER ET AL., LANCET, (2004), vol. 364, no. 9447, pages 1757 - 65 | WO2011US50231 |