EP2814622 - HIGH-PRESSURE WASHING DEVICE AND ADAPTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.01.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.02.2018 [2018/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi Koki Co., Ltd. 15-1, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6020 / JP | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORIE, Noriyuki c/o Hitachi Koki Co. Ltd. 1060 Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP | 02 /
KAMIMURA, Junichi c/o Hitachi Koki Co. Ltd. 1060 Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP | 03 /
SATOU, Shinichirou c/o Hitachi Koki Co. Ltd. 1060 Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP | 04 /
NISHIKAWA, Tomomasa c/o Hitachi Koki Co. Ltd. 1060 Takeda Hitachinaka-shi Ibaraki 312-8502 / JP | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Parker, Andrew James, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/52] | Parker, Andrew James, et al Meissner Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13708243.4 | 14.02.2013 | WO2013JP00801 | Priority number, date | JP20120033403 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012033403 | JP20120033404 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012033404 | JP20120033405 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012033405 | JP20120033406 | 17.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012033406 | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013121782 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2814622 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B08B3/02 | [2014/52] | CPC: |
B08B3/026 (EP,CN,US);
F16L25/0018 (US);
B08B2203/0223 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Title | German: | HOCHDRUCK-WASCHVORRICHTUNG UND ADAPTER | [2014/52] | English: | HIGH-PRESSURE WASHING DEVICE AND ADAPTER | [2014/52] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LAVAGE À HAUTE PRESSION ET ADAPTATEUR | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 06.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 02.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/07] | 05.10.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]WO2004091283 (GREAT STUFF INC [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,12,13,19,21,22 * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0015]; figures 2-5, 8-10, * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0049] * [Y] 5-7,17 [I] 2,3,15,16,24; | [XYI]US2002122730 (DEXTER SHANE [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,12-14,19,21 * column 1, line 1 - line 10 * * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 7; figure - * [Y] 5-7,17 [I] 2,3,5,15,16,22,24; | [Y]DE19630179 (HIRSCH XAVER [DE]) [Y] 5-7,17 * column 1, line 1 - line 10; figure - * * column 2, line 19 - column 4, line 7 *; | [Y]US2007240892 (BROTTO DANIELE C [US], et al) [Y] 5-7,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024]; figure -; table 2 *; | [XAY]DE9204248U (THORWARTH, WILHELM) [X] 1 * page 2, line 3 - line 6; figure - * * page 3 * [A] 2,3 [Y] 5-7,17; | [XY]DE9110027U (KIPP, ANGELIKA) [X] 1 * page 3 - page 4; figure - * [Y] 5-7,17; | [X]EP0962263 (MIEDEN JOHANNES ALBERT [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0011] * | by applicant | JP2005313008 |