EP2820317 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROLLING BEARING CAGE FOR AN AXIAL-RADIAL ROLLING BEARING AND AXIAL-RADIAL ROLLING BEARING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.03.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.10.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Rothe Erde GmbH Tremoniastraße 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2017/24] | For all designated states thyssenkrupp Rothe Erde GmbH Tremoniastraße 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | ||
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states ThyssenKrupp Rothe Erde GmbH Tremoniastraße 5-11 44137 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLAUS, Wolfgang Schlesischer Weg 9 59510 Lippetal / DE | 02 /
JÜRGENS, Reinhard Am Landhaus 27a 59555 Lippstadt / DE | 03 /
SCHNIEDER, Stefan Bergstraße 2 59558 Lippstadt / DE | 04 /
ROLLMANN, Jörg Riantecweg 6 59558 Lippstadt / DE | [2015/24] |
Former [2015/02] | 01 /
CLAUS, Wolfgang Schlesischer Weg 9 59510 Lippetal / DE | ||
02 /
JÜRGENS, Reinhard Danziger Straße 7 59581 Warstein / DE | |||
03 /
SCHNEIDER, Stefan Bergstraße 2 59558 Lippstadt / DE | |||
04 /
ROLLMANN, Jörg Riantecweg 6 59558 Lippstadt / DE | Representative(s) | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Waidmarkt 11 50676 Köln / DE | [2019/14] |
Former [2015/02] | Loock, Jan Pieter, et al Kutzenberger Wolff & Partner Theodor-Heuss-Ring 23 50668 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 13708391.1 | 27.02.2013 | [2019/14] | WO2013EP53948 | Priority number, date | DE201210101651 | 29.02.2012 Original published format: DE102012101651 | [2015/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127865 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820317 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2820317 | Date: | 03.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F16C33/54, B05D1/24, F16C33/56, F16C33/46 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
B05D1/24 (EP,US);
F16C33/48 (US);
F16C19/381 (US);
F16C19/386 (EP,US);
F16C33/00 (US);
F16C33/4629 (EP,US);
F16C33/565 (EP,US);
F16C43/04 (US);
B05D3/0218 (EP,US);
F16C2208/36 (EP,US);
F16C2208/60 (EP);
F16C2223/40 (EP,US);
F16C2240/60 (EP,US);
F16C2300/14 (EP,US);
F16C33/513 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49691 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES WÄLZLAGERKÄFIGS FÜR EIN AXIAL-RADIAL-WÄLZLAGER SOWIE AXIAL-RADIAL-WÄLZLAGER | [2015/02] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING A ROLLING BEARING CAGE FOR AN AXIAL-RADIAL ROLLING BEARING AND AXIAL-RADIAL ROLLING BEARING | [2015/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UNE CAGE DE PALIER À ROULEMENT POUR UN PALIER À ROULEMENT AXIAL-RADIAL AINSI QUE PALIER À ROULEMENT AXIAL-RADIAL | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 23.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.12.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.10.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 14.02.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.02.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.02.2013 | AL | 03.04.2019 | CY | 03.04.2019 | CZ | 03.04.2019 | EE | 03.04.2019 | FI | 03.04.2019 | HR | 03.04.2019 | LT | 03.04.2019 | LV | 03.04.2019 | MC | 03.04.2019 | MK | 03.04.2019 | MT | 03.04.2019 | NL | 03.04.2019 | PL | 03.04.2019 | RS | 03.04.2019 | SI | 03.04.2019 | SK | 03.04.2019 | SM | 03.04.2019 | TR | 03.04.2019 | BG | 03.07.2019 | NO | 03.07.2019 | GR | 04.07.2019 | IS | 03.08.2019 | PT | 03.08.2019 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 27.02.2013 | |
AL | 03.04.2019 | ||
CY | 03.04.2019 | ||
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
MT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
MC | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/26] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SI | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
TR | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/14] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
SM | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
EE | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
SK | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
IS | 03.08.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/52] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
PL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
BG | 03.07.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
LV | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
RS | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
GR | 04.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/49] | AL | 03.04.2019 | |
CZ | 03.04.2019 | ||
FI | 03.04.2019 | ||
HR | 03.04.2019 | ||
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/48] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
PT | 03.08.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | FI | 03.04.2019 | |
LT | 03.04.2019 | ||
NL | 03.04.2019 | ||
NO | 03.07.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | NL | 03.04.2019 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US1224346 (WINGQUIST SVEN GUSTAF [SE]) [Y] 14 * figures 1, 2, 7 *; | [XA]FR1188894 (SKF SVENSKA KULLAGERFAB AB) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 12-15; | [XA]DE1079901 (SCHAEFFLER OHG INDUSTRIEWERK) [X] 11 * the whole document * [A] 12-15; | [A]DE1577915 (RHONE POULENC SA) [A] 1-10 * page 6, line 7 - page 8, line 23 ** figure - *; | [Y]DE1915330 (LEUZE GERHART) [Y] 1-10 * page 1, paragraph 1 * * page 5, lines 10-14 * * page 5, line 28 - page 6, line 1 * * page 6, lines 7-21, 25-28 * * page 7, lines 18-25 * * page 8, lines 1-5, 19-21 * * page 13, line 8 - page 14, line 6 * * figures 1, 2 *; | [IA]GB2062128 (BORG WARNER) [I] 1,7,8 * page 1, lines 15-23, 35-44 * * figure - * [A] 4-6,11; | [YDA]DE19751003 (EMA ELEKTRO MASCHINEN SCHULTZE [DE]) [YD] 5,6 * column 1, lines 3-6 * * column 2, lines 34-39, 45-51, 59-63 * * column 4, lines 49-55 * * column 4, line 65 - column 5, line 12 * * column 5, lines 22-31 * * figure 1 * [A] 1,4,7; | [Y]DE202004007831U (SKF AB [SE]) [Y] 12,13,15 * paragraph [0001] * * figure 1 *; | [XY]JP2009115318 (NTN TOYO BEARING CO LTD) [X] 11 * abstract * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 1-10,12-15; | [Y]DE102008053248 (SCHAEFFLER KG [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * figure 3 * | Examination | DE19731892 | by applicant | DE3041355 | DE19731892 | DE19751003 | WO2011003391 |