EP2830631 - ADMINISTRATION OF ERITORAN OR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS THEREOF TO TREAT ORTHOMYXOVIRUS INFECTIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.10.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Maryland, Baltimore Office of Technology Transfer 620 W.Lexington Street, 4th Floor Baltimore MD 21201 / US | [2015/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VOGEL, Stefanie 10061 Cape Ann Drive Columbia, Maryland 21046 / US | 02 /
SHIREY, Kari Ann 4 Cedar Tree Court Apt. A Cockeysville, Maryland 21030 / US | [2015/06] | Representative(s) | Regimbeau 20, rue de Chazelles 75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | [2015/06] | Application number, filing date | 13708644.3 | 04.03.2013 | [2017/47] | WO2013US28856 | Priority number, date | US201261616784P | 28.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261616784 P | US201361771339P | 01.03.2013 Original published format: US 201361771339 P | [2015/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013148072 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2830631 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2830631 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7024, A61K45/06, A61P31/16 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
A61K31/7024 (EP,CN,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,CN,US);
A61P31/16 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERABREICHUNG VON ERITORAN ODER PHARMAZEUTISCH AKZEPTABLEN SALZEN DAVON ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ORTHOMYXOVIRUSINFEKTIONEN | [2015/06] | English: | ADMINISTRATION OF ERITORAN OR PHARMACEUTICALLY ACCEPTABLE SALTS THEREOF TO TREAT ORTHOMYXOVIRUS INFECTIONS | [2015/06] | French: | ADMINISTRATION D'ERITORAN OU DES SELS PHARMACEUTIQUEMENT ACCEPTABLES DE CELUI-CI POUR TRAITER DES INFECTIONS À ORTHOMYXOVIRUS | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 15.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 15.09.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.10.2017 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 13.10.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2016 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2013 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | RS | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IE | 04.03.2018 | LU | 04.03.2018 | MT | 04.03.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
MT | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 04.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 04.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
RS | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007072824 (KAWANO TETSU [JP], et al) [A] 1-37* the whole document *; | [I]US2010015125 (CRISPE IAN NICHOLAS [US], et al) [I] 1,3-14,16-26,28-37 * paragraphs [0037] , [0118] , [ 0120] * | by applicant | US5681824 | US6906042 | US2008227991 | - NHU ET AL., MUCOSAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 3, no. 1, pages 29 - 39 | - Y. IMAI ET AL., CELL, (2008), vol. 133, pages 235 - 249 | - J. PHARMACEUTICAL SCIENCES, (1977), vol. 66, pages 1 - 19 | - J.R. TEJARO ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2009), vol. 182, pages 634 - 6843 | - OTTOLINI, J. GEN. VIROL., (2005), vol. 86, pages 2523 - 2830 | - M.D. TATE, RESPIRATORY RESEARCH, (20071209), vol. 57, pages 1 - 13 | - SHIREY KA ET AL., J. LEUKOC. BIOL., (2011), vol. 89, no. 3, pages 351 - 7 | - SHIREY KA ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 181, no. 6, pages 4159 - 67 | - SHIREY KA ET AL., MUCOSAL IMMUNOLOGY, (2010), vol. 3, no. 3, pages 291 - 300 |