EP2820684 - OPTOELECTRONIC SEMICONDUCTOR CHIP [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.10.2018 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.04.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstraße 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | [2019/37] |
Former [2015/02] | For all designated states OSRAM Opto Semiconductors GmbH Leibnizstrasse 4 93055 Regensburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MANDL, Martin Kallmünzer Strasse 24 93138 Lappersdorf / DE | 02 /
STRASSBURG, Martin Frankenstrasse 10 93093 Donaustauf / DE | 03 /
KÖLPER, Christopher Liskircherstrasse 11 93049 Regensburg / DE | 04 /
PFEUFFER, Alexander Safferlingstrasse 21 93053 Regensburg / DE | 05 /
RODE, Patrick Amberger Strasse 40 93059 Regensburg / DE | 06 /
LEDIG, Johannes Körnerstrasse 30 38102 Braunschweig / DE | 07 /
NEUMANN, Richard Oberaudorfer Strasse 9 81549 München / DE | 08 /
WAAG, Andreas Pilziggrundstrasse 37 97076 Würzburg / DE | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13708711.0 | 20.02.2013 | WO2013EP53371 | Priority number, date | DE201210101718 | 01.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012101718 | [2015/02] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127672 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820684 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/18, H01L33/08, // H01L33/24 | [2018/15] | CPC: |
H01L33/08 (EP,CN,US);
H01L33/16 (EP,US);
H01L33/18 (CN,US);
H01L33/42 (US);
H01L33/62 (US);
H01L2933/0016 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2015/02] | H01L33/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | OPTOELEKTRONISCHER HALBLEITERCHIP | [2015/02] | English: | OPTOELECTRONIC SEMICONDUCTOR CHIP | [2015/02] | French: | PUCE SEMI-CONDUCTRICE OPTOÉLECTRONIQUE | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.04.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.05.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 04.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.01.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 25.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.04.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1727216 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0020] , [0036] , [0049] , [0053] - [0055]; figures 3c,4,5,9 *; | [A]WO2009009612 (NANOCRYSTAL LLC [US], et al) [A] 1-16* paragraphs [0057] , [0058] , [0064] , [0065]; figures 4(1),4(2) *; | [XAI]US2010155767 (LEE MOON-SANG [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0003] , [0039] , [0046] , [0051]; figure 8 * [A] 2,13,14,16 [I] 3-12,15; | [XAI]DE102010012711 (OSRAM OPTO SEMICONDUCTORS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,11,12 * paragraphs [0012] , [0020] - [0028] - [0040] , [0052] - [0060] - [0075] , [0083] , [0085]; figures 3,4C * [A] 2,13,14,16 [I] 5-10,15 | Examination | WO2011067872 | EP2509119 | WO2011080219 |