EP2831409 - COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE, DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE AND THE METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.12.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.12.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.01.2022 [2022/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Senvion GmbH Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | [2015/36] |
Former [2015/06] | For all designated states Senvion SE Überseering 10 22297 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLACH, Christian Franz-Pantel-Ring 71 24783 Osterrönfeld / DE | [2015/42] |
Former [2015/06] | 01 /
FLACH, Christian Holsteiner Str. 37 24790 Schacht Audorf / DE | Representative(s) | Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/06] | Seemann & Partner Raboisen 6 20095 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 13709758.0 | 28.02.2013 | WO2013EP00587 | Priority number, date | DE201210204858 | 27.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012204858 | [2015/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013143641 | Date: | 03.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2831409 | Date: | 04.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F03D1/06 | [2015/06] | CPC: |
F03D1/0675 (EP,US);
B29C70/48 (US);
B29C70/68 (US);
B29C70/681 (US);
B29K2105/25 (US);
B29K2823/06 (US);
B29K2995/0026 (US);
B29L2031/08 (US);
F05B2280/6003 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/06] | Title | German: | FASERVERBUNDBAUTEIL FÜR EIN ROTORBLATT, FERTIGUNGEINRICHTUNG EINES FASERVERBUNDBAUTEILS FÜR EIN ROTORBLATT UND VERFAHREN ZUM FERTIGEN EINES FASERVERBUNDBAUTEILS FÜR EIN ROTORBLATT | [2015/06] | English: | COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE, DEVICE FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE AND THE METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING A COMPOSITE FIBRE COMPONENT FOR A ROTOR BLADE | [2015/06] | French: | ELÉMENT COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES POUR UNE PALE DE ROTOR, DISPOSITIF DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES POUR UNE PALE DE ROTOR ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION D'UN ÉLÉMENT COMPOSITE RENFORCÉ DE FIBRES POUR UNE PALE DE ROTOR | [2015/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 25.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/06] | 11.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.09.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/04] | 22.09.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2022/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.04.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2021 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP2106900 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,4,5,10,14,15 * abstract * * figures 1-4,7-9 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] - [0009] - [0013] - [0015] - [0019] - [0023] - [0028] , [0031] , [0033] , [0034] , [0037] *; | [XI]US2010135815 (BAGEPALLI BHARAT S [US], et al) [X] 1-4,14-16 * abstract * * figures 2-6 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0006] - [0010] - [0018] - [0022] * [I] 5,6,10,11; | [X]US7922454 (RIDDELL SCOTT GABELL [US]) [X] 1-4,14 * abstract * * figures 2-8 * * column 1, line 37 - column 2, line 36 * * column 4, line 5 - column 7, line 61 * * column 8, line 53 - column 9, line 31 *; | [X]EP2319683 (MITSUBISHI HEAVY IND LTD [JP]) [X] 1,5-7,10-13,15 * abstract * * figures 1a-7 ** paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0003] , [0007] , [0008] , [0011] , [0013] , [0014] , [0020] - [0031] - [0034] - [0041] - [0045] , [0046] , [0052] , [0058] , [0059] *; | [XI]US2011229333 (FLACH CHRISTIAN [DE]) [X] 1-6,9-16 * abstract * * figures 1-9 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0017] - [0029] - [0031] - [0033] - [0039] - [0041] , [0042] , [0045] * [I] 7,8; | [XI]US2012027612 (YARBROUGH AARON [US]) [X] 1-4,14-16 * abstract * * figures 3-7 * * paragraphs [0003] , [0004] , [0007] - [0011] - [0024] - [0031] * [I] 5,6,10,11 | Examination | DE102009033165 | US2011229333 |