Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10253400 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2019 | B2 | US2015086411 | 26.03.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20150116462 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140138624 | Global Dossier | 04.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015514865 | Global Dossier | 21.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104080939 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2823078 | Global Dossier | 30.05.2018 | B1 | EP2823078 | 14.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112014019637 | 28.05.2019 | B1 | BR112014019637 | 11.07.2017 | A8 | BR112014019637 | 20.06.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN8210DELNP2014 | 15.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP54130 | 01.03.2013 | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013131811 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102012203569 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102012203569 | 07.03.2012 |