EP2769396 - ELECTRONIC HOUSING FOR SWITCHING DEVICES, IN PARTICULAR FOR LOW-VOLTAGE SWITCHING DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.10.2017 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FRÖHLICH, Paul Theodor-Heuss-Str. 5 92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 02 /
GEITNER, Manuel Ambergerstraße 15 92289 Ursensollen / DE | 03 /
HOLMER, Wolfgang Thannheimer Str. 13 A 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 04 /
MEIER, Markus Seuloher Weg 1 92286 Rieden / DE | 05 /
RICHTER, Bernhard Bad-Bergzaberner Straße 8 92224 Amberg / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 13709871.1 | 12.03.2013 | WO2013EP54962 | Priority number, date | DE201210204400 | 20.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012204400 | [2014/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139642 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769396 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/02, H05K5/00 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
H01H9/0271 (EP,US);
H01H9/02 (KR,US);
H01H9/00 (KR);
H05K5/00 (KR);
H01H2223/046 (US);
H01H2229/022 (US);
H01H71/025 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONIKGEHÄUSE FÜR SCHALTGERÄTE, INSBESONDERE FÜR NIEDERSPANNUNGSSCHALTGERÄTE | [2014/35] | English: | ELECTRONIC HOUSING FOR SWITCHING DEVICES, IN PARTICULAR FOR LOW-VOLTAGE SWITCHING DEVICES | [2014/35] | French: | BOÎTIER ÉLECTRONIQUE POUR APPAREILLAGE ÉLECTRIQUE, EN PARTICULIER À BASSE TENSION | [2014/35] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 28.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/48] | 19.07.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/48] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0662741 (PILZ GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * figure 2 *; | [XY]EP0912080 (ABB PATENT GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,3-6 * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3 * [Y] 2; | [YDA]EP0976310 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 2 * figures 1,2 *[A] 1,3-6 | Examination | DE7930487U | DE10301003 | US2010277874 | by applicant | EP0976310 |