EP2839490 - METHOD FOR MONITORING A STEP SWITCH [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/09] | METHOD FOR MONITORING AN ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER | ||
[2015/51] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2017 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maschinenfabrik Reinhausen GmbH Falkensteinstrasse 8 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMECKEBIER, Mario Berliner Strasse 10C 93057 Regensburg / DE | 02 /
WINTERER, Alexander Goethestrasse 24 93138 Lappersdorf / DE | [2015/09] | Application number, filing date | 13709921.4 | 18.03.2013 | [2016/11] | WO2013EP55539 | Priority number, date | DE201210103261 | 16.04.2012 Original published format: DE102012103261 | [2015/09] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013156233 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839490 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839490 | Date: | 16.03.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01H9/00 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
H01H9/0005 (EP,US);
G05F1/14 (US);
H01H2009/0061 (EP,US);
H01H9/00 (RU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG EINES STUFENSCHALTERS | [2015/09] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING A STEP SWITCH | [2015/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À LA SURVEILLANCE D'UN COMMUTATEUR À GRADINS | [2015/51] |
Former [2015/09] | METHOD FOR MONITORING AN ON-LOAD TAP CHANGER | ||
Former [2015/09] | PROCÉDÉ DE SURVEILLANCE D'UN CHANGEUR DE PRISES DE CHARGE | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 17.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.01.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.01.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2013 | AL | 16.03.2016 | CY | 16.03.2016 | CZ | 16.03.2016 | DK | 16.03.2016 | EE | 16.03.2016 | FI | 16.03.2016 | HR | 16.03.2016 | LT | 16.03.2016 | LV | 16.03.2016 | MC | 16.03.2016 | MK | 16.03.2016 | MT | 16.03.2016 | NL | 16.03.2016 | PL | 16.03.2016 | RO | 16.03.2016 | RS | 16.03.2016 | SI | 16.03.2016 | SK | 16.03.2016 | SM | 16.03.2016 | IE | 18.03.2016 | LU | 18.03.2016 | BE | 31.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | BG | 16.06.2016 | NO | 16.06.2016 | GR | 17.06.2016 | IS | 16.07.2016 | PT | 18.07.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 18.03.2013 | |
CY | 16.03.2016 | ||
CZ | 16.03.2016 | ||
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MC | 16.03.2016 | ||
MK | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2016 | ||
LU | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
MT | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SI | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/19] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
BG | 16.06.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
DK | 16.03.2016 | ||
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
IE | 18.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
PT | 18.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | CZ | 16.03.2016 | |
EE | 16.03.2016 | ||
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RO | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
SK | 16.03.2016 | ||
SM | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | EE | 16.03.2016 | |
FI | 16.03.2016 | ||
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
PL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/48] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
IS | 16.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/40] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
NL | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
LV | 16.03.2016 | ||
RS | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
LT | 16.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/35] | FI | 16.03.2016 | |
HR | 16.03.2016 | ||
NO | 16.06.2016 | ||
GR | 17.06.2016 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE19746574 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE19744465 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [A]WO0044011 (HYDRO QUEBEC [CA]) [A] 1-3* page 1, line 4 - page 23, line 12; figures 1-17 *; | [AD]DE102010033195 (REINHAUSEN MASCHF SCHEUBECK [DE]) [AD] 1-3 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19746574 | DE19744465 | DE102010033195 |