EP2958797 - QUICK-DISCONNECTING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR KITE- SURF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2016 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2017 [2017/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Engimec S.r.l. Corso Unione Sovietica 612/20 10135 Torino / IT | For all designated states Zangirolami, Marco Via per Castelletto 69 28040 Borgo Ticino (NO) / IT | [2016/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZANGIROLAMI, Marco Via Per Casaletto 69 28040 Borgo Ticino (NO) / IT | [2016/01] | Representative(s) | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Consulenza in Proprietà Industriale Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2016/01] | Garavelli, Paolo A.BRE.MAR. S.R.L. Via Servais 27 10146 Torino / IT | Application number, filing date | 13710054.1 | 09.01.2013 | [2016/01] | WO2013IT00005 | Priority number, date | IT2012TO00059 | 24.01.2012 Original published format: IT TO20120059 | IT2012TO00446 | 23.05.2012 Original published format: IT TO20120446 | [2016/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013111169 | Date: | 01.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2958797 | Date: | 30.12.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/53] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B63B35/79 | [2016/01] | CPC: |
B63H8/18 (EP,US);
F16G11/10 (US);
B63H8/58 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/01] | Title | German: | SCHNELLLÖSENDE VORRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE FÜR KITE-SURFEN | [2016/01] | English: | QUICK-DISCONNECTING DEVICE, IN PARTICULAR FOR KITE- SURF | [2016/01] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR CERF-VOLANT À DISJONCTION RAPIDE | [2016/01] | Entry into regional phase | 06.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 06.08.2014 | Search fee paid | 06.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/53] | 02.08.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/01] | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4452161 (MCCOY DONALD G [AU]) [X] 1-3,9,12 * column 3, line 30 - column 4, line 25; figures 2,3 *; | [X]FR2550455 (LEVACHER ROLAND [FR]) [X] 1,4,12 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]FR2737414 (ARGOUD ROGER JEAN PIERRE [FR]) [A] 1* page 3, line 22 - page 8, line 19; figures 1-6 *; | [X]EP1302398 (ANDY PRESTON T A AP [GB]) [X] 1-4,9,12 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0026]; figures 2b,6a,6b *; | [X]FR2831619 (BALLU ARNAUD [FR]) [X] 1-4,9,12 * page 2, line 4 - page 3, line 33; figures 1a,1b,2a *; | [X]WO2005023631 (CLEEMANN CORNELIA [DE], et al) [X] 1-4,9,12 * pages 6,7; figures 7,8 *; | [X]FR2875788 (SALIOU RONAN [FR]) [X] 1-4,9,12,14,15 * page 7, line 16 - page 9, line 20; figure 5 *; | [X]DE102007027305 (SCHIMPF JOACHIM [DE]) [X] 1,3,4,9,12 * paragraph [0006]; figure 1 * | by applicant | DE102007027305 |