EP2838891 - AROMATIC RING COMPOUND AS GHRELIN O-ACYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/09] | AROMATIC RING COMPOUND | ||
[2016/43] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1 Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAKURA, Nobuyuki c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 02 /
BANNO, Yoshihiro c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 03 /
TERAO, Yoshito c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 04 /
OCHIDA, Atsuko c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 05 /
MORIMOTO, Sachie c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 06 /
KITAMURA, Shuji c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 07 /
TOMATA, Yoshihide c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 08 /
YASUMA, Tsuneo c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 17-85 Jusohonmachi 2-chome Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0024 / JP | 09 /
IKOMA, Minoru c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 10 /
MASUDA, Kei c/o TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL COMPANY LIMITED 26-1 Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Held, Stephan, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2017/31] |
Former [2015/09] | Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 47 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13710076.4 | 22.02.2013 | [2017/31] | WO2013JP55605 | Priority number, date | US201261602888P | 24.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261602888 P | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013125732 | Date: | 29.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2838891 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2838891 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C07D333/60, C07D407/14, C07D417/12, C07D495/04, C07D307/82, A61K31/381, A61K31/343, A61K31/4355, A61K31/4365, A61P3/04 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
C07D333/60 (EP,CN,US);
C07D333/54 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P25/32 (EP);
A61P25/36 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
C07D307/79 (EP,CN,US);
C07D307/80 (EP,CN,US);
C07D307/81 (EP,CN,US);
C07D307/84 (EP,CN,US);
C07D333/64 (EP,CN,US);
C07D333/70 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/04 (EP,CN,US);
C07D405/12 (EP,CN,US);
C07D409/06 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AROMATISCHE RINGVERBINDUNG ALS GHRELIN O-ACYLTRANSFERASE HEMMER | [2016/43] | English: | AROMATIC RING COMPOUND AS GHRELIN O-ACYLTRANSFERASE INHIBITOR | [2016/43] | French: | COMPOSÉ À NOYAU AROMATIQUE COMME INHIBITEURS DE GHRéLINE O-ACYL TRANSFéRASE | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/09] | AROMATISCHE RINGVERBINDUNG | ||
Former [2015/09] | AROMATIC RING COMPOUND | ||
Former [2015/09] | COMPOSÉ À NOYAU AROMATIQUE | Entry into regional phase | 20.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 20.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.08.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 31.07.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 09.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2013 | AL | 02.08.2017 | AT | 02.08.2017 | CY | 02.08.2017 | CZ | 02.08.2017 | DK | 02.08.2017 | EE | 02.08.2017 | FI | 02.08.2017 | HR | 02.08.2017 | LT | 02.08.2017 | LV | 02.08.2017 | MC | 02.08.2017 | MK | 02.08.2017 | NL | 02.08.2017 | PL | 02.08.2017 | PT | 02.08.2017 | RO | 02.08.2017 | RS | 02.08.2017 | SE | 02.08.2017 | SI | 02.08.2017 | SK | 02.08.2017 | SM | 02.08.2017 | TR | 02.08.2017 | BG | 02.11.2017 | NO | 02.11.2017 | GR | 03.11.2017 | IS | 02.12.2017 | IE | 22.02.2018 | LU | 22.02.2018 | MT | 22.02.2018 | BE | 28.02.2018 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CY | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
MK | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
MT | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 22.02.2013 | |
AT | 02.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
MT | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PT | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
MT | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
TR | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
MT | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
MT | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
BE | 28.02.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
IE | 22.02.2018 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
LU | 22.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/44] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
MC | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SI | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
EE | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RO | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
SK | 02.08.2017 | ||
SM | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
CZ | 02.08.2017 | ||
DK | 02.08.2017 | ||
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
LV | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
PL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
BG | 02.11.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
GR | 03.11.2017 | ||
IS | 02.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 02.08.2017 | |
FI | 02.08.2017 | ||
HR | 02.08.2017 | ||
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
RS | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
SE | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 02.08.2017 | |
LT | 02.08.2017 | ||
NL | 02.08.2017 | ||
NO | 02.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 02.08.2017 | |
NO | 02.11.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XD]WO2010143733 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [XD] 1-6 * claims 1,23; compound 233 *; | [YD]EP1630152 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP]) [YD] 1-6 * paragraph [0657]; examples 79,124,135,136,151-154 *; | [AD]WO2008001931 (TAKEDA PHARMACEUTICAL [JP], et al) [AD] 1-6 * examples;; claims 1,16 *; | [A]US2004209936 (BRATTON LARRY D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract *; | [A]US2006014785 (ZHU YAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * examples 4A-44F,5; claims 51-68 * | [Y] - FILZEN ET AL, "Synthesis and SAR of selective benzothiophene, benzofuran, and indole-based peroxisome proliferator-activated receptor delta agonists", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, ELSEVIER SCIENCE, GB, (20070424), vol. 17, no. 13, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2007.04.047, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 3630 - 3635, XP022114551 [Y] 1-6 * figure 3; tables 1,2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2007.04.047 | by applicant | WO2008001931 | WO2010143733 | WO2009137500 | WO0069844 | WO9502402 | WO2007013694 | WO2007018314 | WO2008093639 | WO2008099794 | WO2004041266 | WO2004106276 | WO2005063729 | WO2005063725 | WO2005087710 | WO2005095338 | WO2007013689 | WO2006112549 | WO2007028135 | WO2008047821 | WO2008050821 | WO2008136428 | WO2008156757 | WO0114372 | WO2004039365 | WO9710224 | WO0182925 | WO0187834 | WO0206234 | WO2004048363 | WO2005030740 | WO2005058823 | WO2005113504 | WO2007092751 | - CELL, (2008), vol. 132, pages 387 - 396 | - NATURE MEDICINE, (2009), vol. 15, pages 741 - 745 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2004), vol. 101, pages 8227 - 8232 | - THE NEW ENGLAND JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, (2011), vol. 365, pages 1597 - 1604 | - SCIENCE, (2010), vol. 330, pages 1689 - 1692 | - PROC NATL ACAD SCI USA, (2010), vol. 107, pages 7467 - 7472 | - J NEUROSCI RES, (2009), vol. 87, pages 2718 - 2727 | - J ENDOCRINOL, (2008), vol. 198, pages 511 - 521 | - ENDOCRINOLOGY, (2010), vol. 151, pages 3286 - 3298 | - PROS ONE, (2011), vol. 6, page EL8170 | - ADDICT BIOL, (201103), page 11 | - PSYCHOPHARMACOLOGY, (2010), vol. 211, pages 415 - 422 | - VITAMINS AND HORMONES, (2008), vol. 77, pages 301 - 324 | - J HYPERTENS, (2010), vol. 28, pages 560 - 567 | - "Development of Pharmaceuticals", IYAKUHIN NO KAIHATSU, Design of Molecules, HIROKAWA SHOTEN, (1990), vol. 7, pages 163 - 198 | - THE JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN MEDICAL ASSOCIATION, (2001), vol. 285, pages 2486 - 2497 | - SYNTHESIS, (1981), pages 1 - 27 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1995), vol. 36, pages 6373 - 6374 | - TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1997), vol. 38, pages 5831 - 5834 | - HETEROCYCLES, (1992), pages 2263 - 2267 | - Jikken Kagaku Kouza 4th Edition, vol. 20, pages 282 - 284,366- | - J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1971), vol. 93, pages 2897 - 2904 | - SYNTHESIS, (1975), page 135 | - BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (2006), vol. 14, page 2162 |