EP2814369 - SURFACE MAINTENANCE VEHICLE WITH COMPACT SIDE BRUSH ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.03.2019 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.12.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tennant Company 701 North Lilac Drive Minneapolis, MN 55440 / US | [2014/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHINLER, Kevin, L. 16509 Elm Circle Minnetonka, MN 55345 / US | 02 /
WELLENS, Richard, W. 17110 12th Avenue North Plymouth, MN 55447 / US | [2014/52] | Representative(s) | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [2018/21] |
Former [2014/52] | Howe, Steven Reddie & Grose LLP 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 13710118.4 | 15.02.2013 | [2018/21] | WO2013US26247 | Priority number, date | US201261599771P | 16.02.2012 Original published format: US 201261599771 P | [2014/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013123271 | Date: | 22.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2814369 | Date: | 24.12.2014 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2814369 | Date: | 23.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L11/29, A47L11/40, A47L11/24, A47L11/28, E01H1/05 | [2017/50] | CPC: |
A47L11/29 (EP,US);
A47L11/16 (KR);
A47L11/24 (US);
A47L11/00 (KR);
A47L11/28 (US);
A47L11/293 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2014/52] | A47L11/29, A47L11/40, E01H1/05 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OBERFLÄCHENWARTUNGSFAHRZEUG MIT KOMPAKTER SEITENBÜRSTENANORDNUNG | [2014/52] | English: | SURFACE MAINTENANCE VEHICLE WITH COMPACT SIDE BRUSH ASSEMBLY | [2014/52] | French: | VÉHICULE D'ENTRETIEN DE SURFACE AYANT UN ENSEMBLE BROSSE LATÉRAL COMPACT | [2014/52] | Entry into regional phase | 11.08.2014 | National basic fee paid | 11.08.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.08.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.08.2014 | Examination requested [2014/52] | 23.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 11.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 26.02.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.02.2013 | AL | 23.05.2018 | AT | 23.05.2018 | CY | 23.05.2018 | CZ | 23.05.2018 | DK | 23.05.2018 | EE | 23.05.2018 | ES | 23.05.2018 | FI | 23.05.2018 | HR | 23.05.2018 | LT | 23.05.2018 | LV | 23.05.2018 | MC | 23.05.2018 | MK | 23.05.2018 | NL | 23.05.2018 | PL | 23.05.2018 | RO | 23.05.2018 | RS | 23.05.2018 | SE | 23.05.2018 | SI | 23.05.2018 | SK | 23.05.2018 | SM | 23.05.2018 | TR | 23.05.2018 | BG | 23.08.2018 | NO | 23.08.2018 | GR | 24.08.2018 | IS | 23.09.2018 | PT | 24.09.2018 | IE | 15.02.2019 | LU | 15.02.2019 | MT | 15.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/32] | HU | 15.02.2013 | |
AL | 23.05.2018 | ||
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
MT | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/31] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IS | 23.09.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
MT | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CY | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
MT | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
PT | 24.09.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
MT | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
TR | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.02.2019 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 23.05.2018 | |
AT | 23.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/47] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/45] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
MC | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SI | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
SM | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 23.05.2018 | |
CZ | 23.05.2018 | ||
DK | 23.05.2018 | ||
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
PL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RO | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
SK | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
EE | 23.05.2018 | ||
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | DK | 23.05.2018 | |
ES | 23.05.2018 | ||
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
NL | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
GR | 24.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
LV | 23.05.2018 | ||
RS | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
HR | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
SE | 23.05.2018 | ||
BG | 23.08.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 23.05.2018 | |
FI | 23.05.2018 | ||
LT | 23.05.2018 | ||
NO | 23.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0021784 (MELFORD ENG LTD [GB]) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [A]DE4001088 (FAUN UMWELTTECHNIK GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-23* abstract *; | [A]EP0795647 (DULEVO INT SPA [IT]) [A] 1-23 * abstract *; | [X]WO2011057253 (TENNANT CO [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-5 * |