EP2836567 - TREATMENT FLUIDS COMPRISING A SILICATE COMPLEXING AGENT AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.11.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 09.12.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Halliburton Energy Services, Inc. 10200 Bellaire Boulevard Houston, TX 77072 / US | [2015/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
REYES, Enrique, A. 2607 Meadowview Drive Duncan, OK 73533 / US | 02 /
SMITH, Alyssa 906 Westgate Road Duncan, OK 73533 / US | [2015/08] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/08] | Application number, filing date | 13710279.4 | 11.03.2013 | [2017/02] | WO2013US30174 | Priority number, date | US201213444883 | 12.04.2012 Original published format: US201213444883 | [2015/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013154710 | Date: | 17.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2836567 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2836567 | Date: | 11.01.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K8/74 | [2015/08] | CPC: |
C09K8/74 (EP,US);
C09K8/72 (US);
E21B43/16 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEHANDLUNGSFLÜSSIGKEITEN MIT EINEM SILIKATKOMPLEXBILDNER UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2015/08] | English: | TREATMENT FLUIDS COMPRISING A SILICATE COMPLEXING AGENT AND METHODS FOR USE THEREOF | [2015/08] | French: | FLUIDES DE TRAITEMENT COMPRENANT UN AGENT COMPLEXANT LES SILICATES ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2015/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/08] | 27.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 14.07.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.11.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 30.11.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.11.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.03.2013 | AL | 11.01.2017 | AT | 11.01.2017 | CY | 11.01.2017 | CZ | 11.01.2017 | DK | 11.01.2017 | EE | 11.01.2017 | ES | 11.01.2017 | FI | 11.01.2017 | HR | 11.01.2017 | LT | 11.01.2017 | LV | 11.01.2017 | MC | 11.01.2017 | MK | 11.01.2017 | NL | 11.01.2017 | PL | 11.01.2017 | RO | 11.01.2017 | RS | 11.01.2017 | SE | 11.01.2017 | SI | 11.01.2017 | SK | 11.01.2017 | SM | 11.01.2017 | TR | 11.01.2017 | IE | 11.03.2017 | LU | 11.03.2017 | MT | 11.03.2017 | BE | 31.03.2017 | CH | 31.03.2017 | FR | 31.03.2017 | LI | 31.03.2017 | BG | 11.04.2017 | NO | 11.04.2017 | GR | 12.04.2017 | IS | 11.05.2017 | PT | 11.05.2017 | DE | 03.10.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
TR | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
MT | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
MK | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
MT | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/47] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CY | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
MT | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 11.03.2013 | |
AT | 11.01.2017 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
MT | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
MT | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
BE | 31.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SI | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
IE | 11.03.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
CH | 31.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
LI | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
LU | 11.03.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
DE | 03.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
FR | 31.03.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
SM | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
DK | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
MC | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
EE | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RO | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
SK | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
CZ | 11.01.2017 | ||
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 11.01.2017 | |
ES | 11.01.2017 | ||
FI | 11.01.2017 | ||
HR | 11.01.2017 | ||
LT | 11.01.2017 | ||
LV | 11.01.2017 | ||
NL | 11.01.2017 | ||
PL | 11.01.2017 | ||
RS | 11.01.2017 | ||
SE | 11.01.2017 | ||
BG | 11.04.2017 | ||
NO | 11.04.2017 | ||
GR | 12.04.2017 | ||
IS | 11.05.2017 | ||
PT | 11.05.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2012067576 (REYES ENRIQUE A [US], et al) [X] 1,8,17 * claims 1-6 * * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-16,18-23; | [XI]US2005065036 (TREYBIG DUANE S [US], et al) [X] 1,8,17 * claims 1,6,8,17,39,40 * * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-16,18-23; | [XI]US2010261623 (CASSIDY JUANITA M [US], et al) [X] 1,8,17 * paragraphs [0019] , [0020] , [0022] , [0029] * * the whole document * [I] 2-7,9-16,18-23; | [A]US2367350 (HEIGL JOHN J) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 40; claim 1 * * the whole document * | by applicant | US20100967868 |