Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2015047553 | Global Dossier | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | WO2013FR50341 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140137365 | Global Dossier | 02.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | WO2013FR50341 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6244314B | Global Dossier | 06.12.2017 | B2 | JP2015508172 | 16.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | WO2013FR50341 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104220848B | Global Dossier | 08.09.2017 | B | CN104220848 | 17.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | WO2013FR50341 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2817594 | Global Dossier | 15.11.2017 | B1 | EP2817594 | 31.12.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | WO2013FR50341 | 19.02.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013124580 | Global Dossier | 29.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2987324 | 20.02.2015 | B1 | FR2987324 | 30.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR1251634 | 23.02.2012 |