EP2828652 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A CHROMATOGRAPHY ELUATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2015/05] | PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR ANALYSING A CHROMATOGRAPH ELUATE | ||
[2015/33] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Vétérinaire, Agroalimentaire et de L'Alimentation, Nantes-Atlantique Atlanpôle La Chantrerie Route de Gachet BP 40706 44307 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Ecole Nationale Vétérinaire, Agroalimentaire et De L'Alimentation, Nantes-Atlantique Atlanpole La Chantrerie Route de Gachet BP 40706 44307 Nantes Cedex 3 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VILLIERE, Angelique 13 rue des Landes F-44810 Heric / FR | 02 /
LETHUAUT, Laurent 14 rue des Coquelicots F-44810 Heric / FR | 03 /
PROST, Carole 7 Impasse des Pervenches F-44980 Sainte Luce sur Loire / FR | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2015/05] | Godineau, Valérie, et al Ipsilon Brema-Loyer 3, rue Edouard Nignon 44300 Nantes / FR | Application number, filing date | 13710500.3 | 21.02.2013 | [2015/47] | WO2013FR50359 | Priority number, date | FR20120052488 | 20.03.2012 Original published format: FR 1252488 | [2015/05] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013140057 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828652 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2828652 | Date: | 18.11.2015 | Language: | FR | [2015/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N30/72, G01N30/80, B01D15/08, G01N1/18, G01N30/38 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G01N30/7206 (EP);
G01N30/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE EINES CHROMATOGRAPHISCHEN ELUATS | [2015/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR ANALYZING A CHROMATOGRAPHY ELUATE | [2015/33] | French: | PROCEDE ET INSTALLATION POUR L'ANALYSE D'UN ELUAT DE CHROMATOGRAPHE | [2015/33] |
Former [2015/05] | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANALYSE EINES CHROMATOGRAPHEN-ELUATS | ||
Former [2015/05] | PROCESS AND EQUIPMENT FOR ANALYSING A CHROMATOGRAPH ELUATE | ||
Former [2015/05] | PROCEDE ET UNE INSTALLATION D'ANALYSE D'UN ELUAT DE CHROMATOGRAPHE | Entry into regional phase | 23.06.2014 | National basic fee paid | 23.06.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.06.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.06.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 23.07.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.02.2013 | AL | 18.11.2015 | AT | 18.11.2015 | BG | 18.11.2015 | CY | 18.11.2015 | CZ | 18.11.2015 | EE | 18.11.2015 | FI | 18.11.2015 | HR | 18.11.2015 | LT | 18.11.2015 | LV | 18.11.2015 | MC | 18.11.2015 | MK | 18.11.2015 | MT | 18.11.2015 | PL | 18.11.2015 | RO | 18.11.2015 | RS | 18.11.2015 | SE | 18.11.2015 | SI | 18.11.2015 | SK | 18.11.2015 | SM | 18.11.2015 | TR | 18.11.2015 | NO | 18.02.2016 | GR | 19.02.2016 | IE | 21.02.2016 | IS | 18.03.2016 | PT | 18.03.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/45] | HU | 21.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
TR | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
BG | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.02.2013 | |
AT | 18.11.2015 | ||
CY | 18.11.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MK | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
MT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IE | 21.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SI | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
MC | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
SM | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
EE | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RO | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
SK | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
CZ | 18.11.2015 | ||
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
LV | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.11.2015 | |
FI | 18.11.2015 | ||
HR | 18.11.2015 | ||
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
PL | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
GR | 19.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
PT | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | HR | 18.11.2015 | |
LT | 18.11.2015 | ||
RS | 18.11.2015 | ||
SE | 18.11.2015 | ||
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
IS | 18.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | LT | 18.11.2015 | |
NO | 18.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | LT | 18.11.2015 | Cited in | International search | [AD]US2007163962 (BIDLINGMEYER BRIAN A [US], et al) [AD] 1,10 * figures 1,2,4; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2009154984 (PERKINELMER HEALTH SCI INC [US], et al) [A] 1,10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0004]; claims 1,8,10 *; | [A]EP1248096 (AGILENT TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1,10 * figure 2; claim 1 * | by applicant | US2007163962 |