17.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
05.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.07.2020 [2020/28] |
13.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.04.2020 [2020/16] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
15.02.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.03.2019 [2019/12] |
25.01.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
21.12.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.01.2019 [2019/04] |
23.11.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.12.2018 [2018/52] |
14.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.10.2018 [2018/42] |
07.09.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
31.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.10.2018 [2018/40] |
24.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.09.2018 [2018/39] |
10.08.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
10.08.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 12.09.2018 [2018/37] |
27.07.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] |
01.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.07.2018 [2018/27] |
25.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.06.2018 [2018/26] |
23.05.2018 |
Change - representative |
|
18.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.06.2018 [2018/25] |
11.05.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.06.2018 [2018/24] |
27.04.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.05.2018 [2018/22] |
01.09.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
01.09.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.04.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.03.2017 |
Change - French title |
published on 03.05.2017 [2017/18] |
27.03.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.04.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.11.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.11.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.11.2015 |
First examination report |
|
22.05.2015 |
Change - extension states |
published on 24.06.2015 [2015/26] |
25.03.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.12.2014 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
26.12.2014 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] |
04.12.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.11.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.09.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.04.2014 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.09.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.05.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2013 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|