Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015023561 | ![]() | 23.04.2015 | A3 | WO2015023561 | 19.02.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2015023525 | ![]() | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014182753 | ![]() | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013025451 | ![]() | 06.09.2013 | A3 | WO2013025451 | 21.02.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013020128 | ![]() | 07.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2012075002 | ![]() | 04.10.2012 | A3 | WO2012075002 | 07.06.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201161503248 | 30.06.2011 | US41808410 | 30.11.2010 | US201161562651 | 22.11.2011 | US201113305051 | 28.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011011667 | ![]() | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010042460 | ![]() | 03.06.2010 | A3 | WO2010042460 | 15.04.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | USRE49307E | ![]() | 22.11.2022 | E | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US201414455332 | 08.08.2014 | US201715478571 | 04.04.2017 | US202016902663 | 16.06.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023027062 | ![]() | 26.01.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US201414455332 | 08.08.2014 | US201715478571 | 04.04.2017 | US202217954426 | 28.09.2022 | US202016902663 | 16.06.2020 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2017217827 | ![]() | 03.08.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715485376 | 12.04.2017 | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | US201514615916 | 06.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016347639 | ![]() | 01.12.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US201615162858 | 24.05.2016 | US201562168011 | 29.05.2015 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | US201461933092 | 29.01.2014 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9346699 | ![]() | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2015210583 | 30.07.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US201615162858 | 24.05.2016 | US201562168011 | 29.05.2015 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | US201461933092 | 29.01.2014 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9643883 | ![]() | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2015158758 | 11.06.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | US201514615916 | 06.02.2015 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9346705 | ![]() | 24.05.2016 | B2 | US2015051061 | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414458565 | 13.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9643884 | ![]() | 09.05.2017 | B2 | US2015051060 | 19.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US201414455332 | 08.08.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9764981 | ![]() | 19.09.2017 | B2 | US2015037553 | 05.02.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | US201314380164 | 28.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9868664 | ![]() | 16.01.2018 | B2 | US2015030827 | 29.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | US201314380446 | 27.02.2013 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9527767 | ![]() | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2014335331 | 13.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201414267086 | 01.05.2014 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9530910 | ![]() | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2014150867 | 05.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | US201414176500 | 10.02.2014 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9266769 | ![]() | 23.02.2016 | B2 | US2013255779 | 03.10.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161565050 | 30.11.2011 | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161562651 | 22.11.2011 | US201161503248 | 30.06.2011 | US41808410 | 30.11.2010 | US201313890638 | 09.05.2013 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | US201113305051 | 28.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8975199 | ![]() | 10.03.2015 | B2 | US2013037105 | 14.02.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012132282 | ![]() | 31.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161503248 | 30.06.2011 | US41808410 | 30.11.2010 | US201161562651 | 22.11.2011 | US201113305051 | 28.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8647995 | ![]() | 11.02.2014 | B2 | US2011017297 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8445394 | ![]() | 21.05.2013 | B2 | US2010084016 | 08.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US12134580 | ![]() | 05.11.2024 | B2 | US2022024804 | 27.01.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615136189 | 22.04.2016 | US201414458565 | 13.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US202117492772 | 04.10.2021 | US201816142814 | 26.09.2018 | US202117221926 | 05.04.2021 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11168018 | ![]() | 09.11.2021 | B2 | US2021221730 | 22.07.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615136189 | 22.04.2016 | US201414458565 | 13.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201816142814 | 26.09.2018 | US202117221926 | 05.04.2021 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10988405 | ![]() | 27.04.2021 | B2 | US2019023606 | 24.01.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615136189 | 22.04.2016 | US201414458565 | 13.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201816142814 | 26.09.2018 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10347782 | ![]() | 09.07.2019 | B2 | US2014158201 | 12.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161565050 | 30.11.2011 | US201214236824 | 06.08.2012 | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10294139 | ![]() | 21.05.2019 | B2 | US2018370837 | 27.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US201615162858 | 24.05.2016 | US201562168011 | 29.05.2015 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | US201461933092 | 29.01.2014 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | US201816115998 | 29.08.2018 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10196297 | ![]() | 05.02.2019 | B2 | US2016145146 | 26.05.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201161565050 | 30.11.2011 | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161562651 | 22.11.2011 | US201161503248 | 30.06.2011 | US41808410 | 30.11.2010 | US201313890638 | 09.05.2013 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | US201615013417 | 02.02.2016 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | US201113305051 | 28.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10112865 | ![]() | 30.10.2018 | B2 | US2016236972 | 18.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201615136189 | 22.04.2016 | US201414458565 | 13.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10000409 | ![]() | 19.06.2018 | B2 | US2017291845 | 12.10.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | US201414455332 | 08.08.2014 | US201715478571 | 04.04.2017 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20220003632 | ![]() | 10.01.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | KR20167006450 | 08.08.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160097385 | ![]() | 17.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20160043026 | ![]() | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR20140052008 | ![]() | 02.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102753327B | ![]() | 10.01.2025 | B1 | KR20230049133 | 12.04.2023 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | KR20217042618 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102255630B | ![]() | 25.05.2021 | B1 | KR20160043008 | 20.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50486 | 11.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102250735B | ![]() | 12.05.2021 | B1 | KR20140129345 | 06.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102243019B | ![]() | 22.04.2021 | B1 | KR20160006715 | 19.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US37043 | 07.05.2014 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102100992B | ![]() | 16.04.2020 | B1 | KR20140141623 | 10.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102059555B | ![]() | 11.02.2020 | B1 | KR20190008418 | 23.01.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102018833B | ![]() | 05.09.2019 | B1 | KR20140064860 | 28.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012US50224 | 10.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101891459B | ![]() | 23.08.2018 | B1 | KR20170121338 | 01.11.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101647526B | ![]() | 10.08.2016 | B1 | KR20110066225 | 16.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101426174B | ![]() | 01.08.2014 | B1 | KR20120049296 | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019091913 | ![]() | 13.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2017216465 | ![]() | 07.12.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6584013B | ![]() | 02.10.2019 | B2 | JP2016528153 | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50486 | 11.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016528152 | ![]() | 15.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6784592B | ![]() | 11.11.2020 | B2 | JP2016517841 | 20.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US37043 | 07.05.2014 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6417531B | ![]() | 07.11.2018 | B2 | JP2016084280 | 19.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6371267B | ![]() | 08.08.2018 | B2 | JP2016052989 | 14.04.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6214570B | ![]() | 18.10.2017 | B2 | JP2015516930 | 18.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6162156B | ![]() | 12.07.2017 | B2 | JP2015512852 | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5883174B | ![]() | 09.03.2016 | B2 | JP2015164893 | 17.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6193280B | ![]() | 06.09.2017 | B2 | JP2015129083 | 16.07.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5826935B | ![]() | 02.12.2015 | B2 | JP2014528889 | 30.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012US50224 | 10.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2014527299 | ![]() | 09.10.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5686801B | ![]() | 18.03.2015 | B2 | JP2013500229 | 07.01.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6042613B | ![]() | 14.12.2016 | B2 | JP2012504548 | 23.02.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3831785 | ![]() | 09.06.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | EP14755493 | 08.08.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3633740 | ![]() | 08.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP12748620 | 06.08.2012 | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3033310 | ![]() | 10.03.2021 | B1 | EP3033310 | 22.06.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3033227 | ![]() | 22.06.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50486 | 11.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2994434 | ![]() | 21.07.2021 | B1 | EP2994434 | 16.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2014US37043 | 07.05.2014 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2819965 | ![]() | 19.09.2018 | B1 | EP2819965 | 07.01.2015 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2742010 | ![]() | 18.06.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012US50224 | 10.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2740160 | ![]() | 08.01.2020 | B1 | EP2740160 | 11.06.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2456727 | ![]() | 12.02.2025 | B2 | EP2456727 | 26.05.2021 | B1 | EP2456727 | 30.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2349938 | ![]() | 21.02.2018 | B1 | EP2349938 | 03.08.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN113060935 | ![]() | 02.07.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | CN201480056637 | 08.08.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN107285624 | ![]() | 24.10.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | CN201080038266 | 23.07.2010 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106956480B | ![]() | 15.10.2019 | B | CN106956480 | 18.07.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CN201280042914 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN106746600 | ![]() | 31.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | CN201280037518 | 10.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105980147B | ![]() | 24.07.2020 | B | CN105980147 | 28.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50486 | 11.08.2014 | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105849059B | ![]() | 09.07.2021 | B | CN105849059 | 10.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105764865 | ![]() | 13.07.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US50279 | 08.08.2014 | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105358497B | ![]() | 20.04.2021 | B | CN105358497 | 24.02.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2014US37043 | 07.05.2014 | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104960282B | ![]() | 30.07.2019 | B | CN104960282 | 07.10.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201461933092 | 29.01.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104379532B | ![]() | 24.08.2021 | B9 | CN104379532B | 30.07.2021 | B | CN104379532 | 25.02.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103796829B | ![]() | 22.09.2017 | B | CN103796829 | 14.05.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2012US49718 | 06.08.2012 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103732551B | ![]() | 17.05.2017 | B | CN103732551 | 16.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | WO2012US50224 | 10.08.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102639454 | ![]() | 15.08.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010275513B | ![]() | 02.07.2015 | B2 | AU2010275513 | 01.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009302561 | ![]() | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2819961 | ![]() | 08.09.2021 | B1 | EP2819961 | 07.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2739098 | 15.04.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2769014 | 27.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102171154 | 31.08.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105271723 | 27.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | CN200980140405 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN690DELNP2012 | 19.06.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN7444DELNP2014 | 24.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | WO2013US28093 | 27.02.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | IN7749DELNP2014 | 15.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28177 | 28.02.2013 | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2011003630 | 31.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US57321309 | 05.10.2009 | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | WO2009US59607 | 06.10.2009 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2012001054 | 12.06.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2011118352 | 20.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2012106650 | 27.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SG178099 | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84075410 | 21.07.2010 | WO2010US43027 | 23.07.2010 | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI403482B | 01.08.2013 | B | TW201022174 | 16.06.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | US10312608 | 06.10.2008 | US17782709 | 13.05.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI534115B | 21.05.2016 | B | TW201118054 | 01.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US26393009 | 24.11.2009 | US22829009 | 24.07.2009 | US34758910 | 24.05.2010 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201228976 | 16.07.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161503248 | 30.06.2011 | US41808410 | 30.11.2010 | US201161562651 | 22.11.2011 | US201113305051 | 28.11.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI548606B | 11.09.2016 | B | TW201311602 | 16.03.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI691097B | 11.04.2020 | B | TW201316528 | 16.04.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201161565050 | 30.11.2011 | US201161515042 | 04.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI646065B | 01.01.2019 | B | TW201444781 | 01.12.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI638792B | 21.10.2018 | B | TW201509858 | 16.03.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361878829 | 17.09.2013 | US201361866168 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI650298B | 11.02.2019 | B | TW201512144 | 01.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI597251B | 01.09.2017 | B | TW201639799 | 16.11.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US201213569756 | 08.08.2012 | US201161522956 | 12.08.2011 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI679184B | 11.12.2019 | B | TW201920031 | 01.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361866272 | 15.08.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI723298B | 01.04.2021 | B | TW201920033 | 01.06.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US201361821426 | 09.05.2013 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013130718 | ![]() | 06.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013130665 | ![]() | 16.01.2014 | A3 | WO2013130665 | 06.09.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI614227B | 11.02.2018 | B | TW201335097 | 01.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604839 | 29.02.2012 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI606989B | 01.12.2017 | B | TW201341334 | 16.10.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | US201261604833 | 29.02.2012 |