Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9216880 | Global Dossier | 22.12.2015 | B2 | US2013228644 | 05.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313785167 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015513507 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN104159839B | Global Dossier | 22.02.2017 | B | CN104159839 | 19.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013230179B | Global Dossier | 14.07.2016 | B2 | AU2013230179 | 04.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2822886 | Global Dossier | 14.01.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2865017 | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1200796 | 14.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013US28995 | 05.03.2013 | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2013134191 | Global Dossier | 12.09.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201261606520 | 05.03.2012 |