EP2822886 - HEADER SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.03.2017 [2017/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interface, Inc. 2859 Paces Ferry Road Suite 2000 Atlanta, Georgia 30339 / US | [2015/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIS, Tammy Michelle 1510 Cannonvile Road LaGrange, Georgia 30240 / US | 02 /
DAUGHERTY, Johnny E. 179 Lee Road 377 Valley, Alabama 36854 / US | 03 /
HARRELL, Brian H. 273 Tallyho Drive Auburn, Alabama 36832 / US | 04 /
INGRAM III, William Oscar 87 Lee Road 380 Valley, Alabama 36854 / US | [2015/03] | Representative(s) | Phillips & Leigh LLP Temple Chambers 3-7 Temple Avenue London EC4Y 0DA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/03] | Phillips & Leigh 5 Pemberton Row London EC4A 3BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 13710724.9 | 05.03.2013 | WO2013US28995 | Priority number, date | US201261606520P | 05.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261606520 P | [2015/03] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013134191 | Date: | 12.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2822886 | Date: | 14.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65H49/16, B65H57/12, B65H57/16, D03D39/06, D05C15/18 | [2015/03] | CPC: |
B65H49/16 (EP,US);
B65H57/06 (US);
B65H57/12 (EP,US);
B65H57/16 (EP,US);
D03D39/06 (EP,US);
D05C15/18 (EP,US);
B65H2701/31 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/03] | Title | German: | KOPFZEILENSYSTEM | [2015/03] | English: | HEADER SYSTEM | [2015/03] | French: | SYSTÈME COLLECTEUR | [2015/03] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/03] | 17.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/10] | 28.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5588383 (DAVIS DAVID L [US], et al) [X] 1,3-8,10,11,13-16* column 18, line 27 - column 19, line 8; figure 19 *; | [XI]WO0027532 (INTERFACE INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3-7 * page 7, lines 4-9; figures 1-5 * [I] 11,13-16; | [XDI]US2011308438 (INGRAM III WILLIAM OSCAR [US], et al) [XD] 1,3,18 * paragraph [0010] * [I] 4-6,9,20 |