EP2970829 - FABRIC CONDITIONER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.09.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUTISTA CID, Oscar Presa la Angostura No. 225 Col. Irrigacion Mexico D.F. 11500 / MX | 02 /
TOVAR PESCADOR, Jose Javier Presa la Angostura No. 225 Col. Irrigacion Mexico D.F. 11500 / MX | 03 /
LEON NAVARRO, Juan Antonio Presa la Angostura No. 225 Col. Irrigacion Mexico D.F. 11500 / MX | [2016/03] | Representative(s) | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Limited Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2016/03] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13710774.4 | 11.03.2013 | [2016/03] | WO2013US30159 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014142787 | Date: | 18.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2970829 | Date: | 20.01.2016 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2016/03] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 18.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C11D3/37, C11D11/00 | [2016/03] | CPC: |
C11D3/3742 (EP,US);
C11D3/001 (US);
C11D3/3707 (US);
C11D2111/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/03] | Title | German: | WÄSCHEWEICHMACHER | [2016/03] | English: | FABRIC CONDITIONER | [2016/03] | French: | ASSOUPLISSANT TEXTILE | [2016/03] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2015 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2015 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 14.09.2015 | Examination requested [2016/03] | 10.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/44] | 10.05.2016 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2016/44] | 16.06.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.09.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2013032493 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-18 * example -; claim - *; | [Y]WO2013032479 (COLGATE PALMOLIVE CO [US], et al) [Y] 1-18* example -; claim - * | by applicant | US3915867 | US4806345 | WO9012862 | US6864223 |