EP2825157 - AMINOACID LIPIDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2019 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.08.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.05.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2015/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PLATSCHER, Michael Wilhelm Im Buck 11 CH-8252 Schlatt / CH | 02 /
BEHRENDT, Raymond Fasanenweg 7 78224 Singen / DE | 03 /
GROEHN, Viola Neuwingerstrasse 9 CH-8447 Dachsen / CH | 04 /
HOERTNER, Simone Rachel Kanzleistrasse 135 CH-8004 Zuerich / CH | 05 /
PASSAFARO, Marco Silvio Schlatterweg 26 CH-8240 Thayngen / CH | 06 /
BAUER, Finn Wilhelmstrasse 191 b 64625 Bensheim / DE | [2018/36] |
Former [2015/04] | 01 /
PLATSCHER, Michael Wilhelm Im Buck 11 CH-8252 Schlatt / CH | ||
02 /
BEHRENDT, Raymond Fasanenweg 7 78224 Singen / DE | |||
03 /
GROEHN, Viola Bahnhofstrasse 2 CH-8447 Dachsen / CH | |||
04 /
HOERTNER, SimoneRachel Kanzleistrasse 135 CH-8004 Zuerich / CH | |||
05 /
PASSAFARO, Marco Silvio Schlatterweg 26 CH-8240 Thayngen / CH | |||
06 /
BAUER, Finn Wilhelmstrasse 191 b 64625 Bensheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13710787.6 | 11.03.2013 | [2018/36] | WO2013EP00699 | Priority number, date | EP20120001793 | 16.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12001793 | [2015/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013135360 | Date: | 19.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2825157 | Date: | 21.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2825157 | Date: | 05.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/127, C07C237/08, C07C237/10, C07C271/22 | [2018/21] | CPC: |
C07C271/22 (EP,RU,US);
A61K9/1272 (EP,RU,US);
C07C237/30 (RU,US);
C07C237/06 (US);
C07C237/08 (EP,RU,US);
C07C237/10 (EP,US);
C07C237/22 (RU,US);
C07C59/185 (US);
C07C2603/18 (EP,US);
Y02P20/55 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2015/04] | A61K9/127, C07C271/22, C07C237/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/04] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AMINOSÄURELIPIDE | [2015/04] | English: | AMINOACID LIPIDS | [2015/04] | French: | LIPIDES D'ACIDES AMINÉS | [2015/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.07.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.07.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.07.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.07.2014 | Examination requested [2015/04] | 09.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.01.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.01.2017 | Opposition(s) | 06.06.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 05.09.2018 | CY | 05.09.2018 | EE | 05.09.2018 | HR | 05.09.2018 | LT | 05.09.2018 | LV | 05.09.2018 | MC | 05.09.2018 | MK | 05.09.2018 | RO | 05.09.2018 | RS | 05.09.2018 | SK | 05.09.2018 | SM | 05.09.2018 | TR | 05.09.2018 | BG | 05.12.2018 | IS | 05.01.2019 | LU | 11.03.2019 | MT | 11.03.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/26] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
CY | 05.09.2018 | ||
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
MT | 11.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
MT | 11.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
TR | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
Former [2020/01] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
LU | 11.03.2019 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
MC | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/27] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
SM | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
EE | 05.09.2018 | ||
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
SK | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RO | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
IS | 05.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 05.09.2018 | |
HR | 05.09.2018 | ||
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
LV | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | HR | 05.09.2018 | |
LT | 05.09.2018 | ||
RS | 05.09.2018 | ||
BG | 05.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 05.09.2018 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4144036 (CUMMINGS WILLIAM M); | [Y]EP1420010 (OXYGENIX CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2009129387 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al); | [XP]WO2012148891 (EVONIK DEGUSSA CORP [US], et al) | by applicant | WO7900515 | US5416016 | US5498633 | WO9852614 | WO9966063 | US6030954 | US6214388 | US6316024 | US6335434 | WO02094185 | WO03039594 | US2003138490 | WO2007087341 |