EP2828656 - METHOD FOR MONITORING HIV SPECIFIC T CELL RESPONSES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.07.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.08.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.03.2019 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fundació Privada Institut de Recerca de la SIDA-Caixa Hospital Universitari Germans Trias i Pujol Carretera de Canyet, s/n 08916 Badalona / ES | [2018/13] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states LABORATORIOS DEL DR. ESTEVE, S.A. Av. Mare de Déu de Montserrat, 221 08041 Barcelona / ES | ||
For all designated states Fundació Privada Institut de Recerca de la SIDA-Caixa Hospital Universitari Germans Trias i Pujol Carretera de Canyet, s/n 08916 Badalona / ES | |||
For all designated states Institució Catalana de Recerca i Estudis Avançats Passeig Lluís Companys, 23 08010 Barcelona / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUIZ RIOL, Marta Vilafranca de Penedes 1, 1º 1ª E-17320 Tossa de Mar / ES | 02 /
BRANDER, Christian Can Bruguera 3-5 Esc A Bj 1a E-08391 Tiana / ES | 03 /
IBARRONDO, Javier 11006 Rhoda Way Culver City, California 90230 / US | [2019/37] |
Former [2015/05] | 01 /
RUIZ RIOL, Marta Plaza Aragón 40 3º 2ª E-08915 Badalona / ES | ||
02 /
BRANDER, Christian Can Bruguera 3-5 Esc A Bj 1a E-08391 Tiana / ES | |||
03 /
IBARRONDO, Javier 11006 Rhoda Way Culver City, California 90230 / US | Representative(s) | ABG Intellectual Property Law, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | [2019/38] |
Former [2015/05] | ABG Patentes, S.L. Avenida de Burgos, 16D Edificio Euromor 28036 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 13711681.0 | 22.03.2013 | [2019/38] | WO2013EP56110 | Priority number, date | EP20120382109 | 23.03.2012 Original published format: EP 12382109 | US201261615038P | 23.03.2012 Original published format: US 201261615038 P | [2015/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013139972 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2828656 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2828656 | Date: | 18.09.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, G01N33/569 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
G01N33/505 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/6866 (US);
G01N33/5091 (EP,CN,US);
G01N33/56988 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/15 (US);
G01N2333/52 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/525 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/54 (EP,CN,US);
G01N2333/555 (EP,CN,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | 07.10.2014 | ME | 07.10.2014 | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG HIV-SPEZIFISCHER T-ZELL-ANTWORTEN | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD FOR MONITORING HIV SPECIFIC T CELL RESPONSES | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ PERMETTANT DE SURVEILLER LES RÉPONSES DES LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DU VIH | [2019/16] |
Former [2015/05] | PROCÉDÉ POUR SURVEILLER DES RÉPONSES DE LYMPHOCYTES T SPÉCIFIQUES DU VIH | Entry into regional phase | 07.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 07.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 04.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.01.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.04.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.03.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 11.03.2019 | 11.03.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.03.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 19.06.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 06.03.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.03.2013 | AL | 18.09.2019 | AT | 18.09.2019 | CY | 18.09.2019 | CZ | 18.09.2019 | DK | 18.09.2019 | EE | 18.09.2019 | FI | 18.09.2019 | HR | 18.09.2019 | LT | 18.09.2019 | LV | 18.09.2019 | MC | 18.09.2019 | MK | 18.09.2019 | MT | 18.09.2019 | PL | 18.09.2019 | RO | 18.09.2019 | RS | 18.09.2019 | SI | 18.09.2019 | SK | 18.09.2019 | SM | 18.09.2019 | TR | 18.09.2019 | BG | 18.12.2019 | NO | 18.12.2019 | GR | 19.12.2019 | IS | 19.01.2020 | PT | 20.01.2020 | IE | 22.03.2020 | LU | 22.03.2020 | [2022/32] |
Former [2022/27] | HU | 22.03.2013 | |
AL | 18.09.2019 | ||
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CY | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
MT | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
Former [2022/26] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
TR | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/08] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IE | 22.03.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
LU | 22.03.2020 | ||
Former [2020/49] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
MC | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/37] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SI | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/36] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
DK | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
IS | 19.01.2020 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
SM | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/25] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
CZ | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
SK | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
IS | 24.02.2020 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
AT | 18.09.2019 | ||
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
PL | 18.09.2019 | ||
RO | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/22] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
EE | 18.09.2019 | ||
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
PT | 20.01.2020 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AL | 18.09.2019 | |
FI | 18.09.2019 | ||
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/11] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
HR | 18.09.2019 | ||
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
LV | 18.09.2019 | ||
RS | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
GR | 19.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/10] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
BG | 18.12.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | FI | 18.09.2019 | |
LT | 18.09.2019 | ||
NO | 18.12.2019 | ||
Former [2020/08] | LT | 18.09.2019 | |
NO | 18.12.2019 | Cited in | International search | [XY] - M. RICHMOND ET AL, "Epitope Mapping of HIV-Specific CD8+ T Cell Responses by Multiple Immunological Readouts Reveals Distinct Specificities Defined by Function", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (20110201), vol. 85, no. 3, doi:10.1128/JVI.01707-10, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 1275 - 1286, XP055045478 [X] 1-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 1276, column 1, lines 25-27 * * page 1276, column 1, line 38 - page 1276, column 2, line 5 * * page 1276, column 2, lines 6-10 * * page 1277, column 2, line 5 - page 1278, column 1, line 13 * [Y] 12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.01707-10 | [XI] - BETTS MICHAEL R ET AL, "HIV nonprogressors preferentially maintain highly functional HIV-specific CD8(+) T cells", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 107, no. 12, doi:10.1182/BLOOD-2005-12-4818, ISSN 0006-4971, (20060615), pages 4781 - 4789, (20060207), XP002565549 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * page 4781, column 2, lines 15-22 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 49-60 * * page 4783, column 1, line 40 - page 4783, column 2, line 25 * * page 4783, column 2, lines 48-51 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 41-42 * * figures 1-2 * * page 4782, column 1, lines 2-7 * * page 4783, column 2, line 65 - page 4785, column 2, line 15 * [I] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2005-12-4818 | [XI] - FATEMA A. LEGRAND ET AL, "Strong HIV-1-Specific T Cell Responses in HIV-1-Exposed Uninfected Infants and Neonates Revealed after Regulatory T Cell Removal", PLOS ONE, (20060101), vol. 1, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0000102, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 10, XP055045479 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * page 2, column 1, line 56 - page 3, column 2, line 3 * * page 2, column 1, lines 57-59 * * page 2, column 2, lines 60-63 * * page 3, column 1, lines 10-17 * * page 6, column 2, lines 1-6 * * page 5, column 2, line 5 - page 6, column 2, line 21 * * figures 2-3 * [I] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0000102 | [XY] - PRATIP K. CHATTOPADHYAY ET AL, "Good cell, bad cell: Flow cytometry reveals T-cell subsets important in HIV disease", CYTOMETRY PART A, (20100701), vol. 77A, no. 7, doi:10.1002/cyto.a.20905, ISSN 1552-4922, pages 614 - 622, XP055045480 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 618, column 1, line 18 - page 618, column 2, line 29 * * page 620, column 1, lines 28-33 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cyto.a.20905 | [XY] - PETER W. HUNT ET AL, "A Low T Regulatory Cell Response May Contribute to Both Viral Control and Generalized Immune Activation in HIV Controllers", PLOS ONE, (20110101), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0015924, ISSN 1932-6203, pages 1 - 10, XP055045482 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 2, column 1, lines 16-20 * * page 3, column 2, lines 8-10 * * page 8, column 1, lines 1-26 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0015924 | [XY] - PAULINE MEIJ ET AL, "Identification and prevalence of CD8+ T-cell responses directed against Epstein-Barr virus-encoded latent membrane protein 1 and latent membrane protein 2", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, (20020501), vol. 99, no. 1, doi:10.1002/ijc.10309, ISSN 0020-7136, pages 93 - 99, XP055063518 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 93, column 1, line 34 - page 94, column 1, line 2 * * page 94, column 1, lines 19-50 * * page 94, column 2, lines 14-17 * * page 97, column 1, lines 5-9 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.10309 | [XY] - J. D. LUNEMANN ET AL, "EBNA1-specific T cells from patients with multiple sclerosis cross react with myelin antigens and co-produce IFN- and IL-2", BLOOD, (20080728), vol. 107, no. 12, doi:10.1084/jem.20031598, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 4781 - 1773, XP055063557 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 1765, column 1, lines 31-36 * * page 1765, column 1, lines 48-53 * * page 1765, column 2, lines 10-16 * * page 1766, column 1, lines 1-3 * * page 1766, column 2, lines 5-19 * * page 1769, column 1, lines 37-48 * * page 1769, column 2, lines 27-30 * * page 1770, column 2, line 30 - page 1771, column 1, line 3 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20072397 | [XY] - W. ZHOU ET AL, "Impact of donor CMV status on viral infection and reconstitution of multifunction CMV-specific T cells in CMV-positive transplant recipients", BLOOD, (20090618), vol. 113, no. 25, doi:10.1182/blood-2009-02-203307, ISSN 0006-4971, pages 6465 - 6476, XP055045483 [X] 1-3,5-11,14,22 * abstract * * page 6466, column 1, lines 1-7 * * page 6466, column 1, line 38 - page 6466, column 2, line 2 * * page 6469, column 1, lines 3-5 * * page 6470, column 2, lines 4-6 * * page 6473, column 2, lines 35-38 * [Y] 4,12,13,15-21,23-29 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-02-203307 | [Y] - KOLLS J K ET AL, "The role of Th17 cytokines in primary mucosal immunity", CYTOKINE AND GROWTH FACTOR REVIEWS, ELSEVIER LTD, GB, vol. 21, no. 6, ISSN 1359-6101, (20101201), pages 443 - 448, (20101201), XP027543806 [Y] 1-29 * abstract * * page 443, column 1, line 8 - page 443, column 2, line 8 * * page 444, column 1, lines 12-15 * * page 444, column 1, lines 21-24 * * page 444, column 2, lines 11-14 * * page 445, column 1, lines 7-10 * * page 445, column 1, line 59 - page 445, column 2, line 4 * * page 445, column 2, lines 51-57 * * page 445, column 2, lines 63-66 * * page 446, column 1, lines 33-44 * | [YD] - NICOLE FRAHM ET AL, "Increased sequence diversity coverage improves detection of HIV-specific T cell responses.", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (20071101), vol. 179, no. 10, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 6638 - 6650, XP055045486 [YD] 1-29 * abstract * * page 6638, column 2, lines 7-24 * * page 6639, column 2, lines 45-54 * * page 6639, column 2, lines 67-70 * * page 6641, column 1, lines 15-20 * * page 6643, column 1, lines 1-2 * * page 6643, column 2, lines 5-14 * * page 6646, column 1, lines 16-21 * * page 6646, column 2, lines 19-25 * * page 6646, column 2, lines 30-32 * * page 6647, column 2, lines 7-12 * * page 6648, column 2, lines 5-10 * * page 6648, column 2, lines 50-55 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.179.10.6638 | [YD] - BRANDER C ET AL., "Capturing viral diversity for in-vitro test reagents and HIV vaccine immunogen design", CURR. OPIN. HIV AIDS, (2007), vol. 2, no. 3, doi:10.1097/COH.0b013e3280f3bfe2, pages 183 - 188, XP009164948 [YD] 1-29 * page 186, column 1, lines 15-20 * * page 186, column 1, lines 39-45 * * page 186, column 1, line 56 - page 186, column 2, line 5 * * page 186, column 2, lines 15-28 * * page 187, column 2, lines 14-21 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1097/COH.0b013e3280f3bfe2 | Examination | - LAURIE LAMOREAUX ET AL, "Intracellular cytokine optimization and standard operating procedure", NATURE PROTOCOLS, GB, (20061101), vol. 1, no. 3, doi:10.1038/nprot.2006.268, ISSN 1754-2189, pages 1507 - 1516, XP055296298 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nprot.2006.268 | by applicant | - BRANDER C ET AL., CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2006), vol. 18, no. 4, pages 430 - 437 | - GASCHEN B ET AL., SCIENCE, (2002), vol. 296, pages 2354 - 2360 | - YUSIM K ET AL., J. VIROL., (2002), vol. 76, no. 17, pages 8757 - 8768 | - FRAHM N ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 179, pages 6638 - 6650 | - ADLER M ET AL., BRIT. MED. J., (1987), vol. 294, pages 1145 - 1147 | - BEYRER, C. ET AL., J.INFECT.DIS., (1999), vol. 79, pages 59 - 68 | - DEEKS S ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2007), vol. 27, pages 406 - 416 | - FERRE A ET AL., BLOOD, (2009), vol. 113, no. 17, pages 3978 - 3989 | - LAMOREAUX, L., NAT PROTOC., (2006), vol. 1, pages 1507 - 1516 |