EP2888390 - A BISMUTH-DOPED SEMI-INSULATING GROUP III NITRIDE WAFER AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.09.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.01.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.02.2021 [2021/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sixpoint Materials Inc. 37 Industrial Way, Unit 106 Buellton, CA 93427 / US | For all designated states Seoul Semiconductor Co., Ltd. 148-29, Kasan-Dong Keumchun-Gu Seoul / KR | [2015/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Tadao 5270 Calle Barquero Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | 02 /
LETTS, Edward 420 Sycamore Drive Buellton, California 93427 / US | 03 /
HOFF, Sierra 202 N Melwood Ave Tucson, Arizona 85745 / US | [2015/29] |
Former [2015/27] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Tadao 5066 Calle Real B Santa Barbara, California 93111 / US | ||
02 /
LETTS, Edward 371 Sycamore Drive Buellton, California 93427 / US | |||
03 /
HOFF, Sierra 471 2nd Street Unit K-2 Solvang, California 93463 / US | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/27] | Srinivasan, Ravi Chandran J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13711762.8 | 28.02.2013 | WO2013US28416 | Priority number, date | US201261693122P | 24.08.2012 Original published format: US 201261693122 P | [2015/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2014031152 | Date: | 27.02.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2888390 | Date: | 01.07.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2014 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | C30B29/40, C30B7/10, C30B28/04, C30B9/00 | [2015/27] | CPC: |
C30B7/105 (EP,US);
C30B29/40 (CN);
B24B37/042 (EP,US);
B28D5/00 (EP,US);
C30B28/04 (EP,CN,US);
C30B29/403 (EP,US);
C30B7/10 (CN);
C30B9/00 (EP,CN,US);
H01L21/02013 (US);
H01L21/02389 (US);
H01L29/2003 (US);
H01L29/207 (US);
H01L29/22 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/27] | Title | German: | WISMUTDOTIERTE HALBISOLIERENDE GRUPPE-III-NITRID-WAFER UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG | [2015/27] | English: | A BISMUTH-DOPED SEMI-INSULATING GROUP III NITRIDE WAFER AND ITS PRODUCTION METHOD | [2015/27] | French: | TRANCHE DE SEMI-ISOLANT À BASE DE NITRURE DU GROUPE III DOPÉ AU BISMUTH ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION | [2015/27] | Entry into regional phase | 20.03.2015 | National basic fee paid | 20.03.2015 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.03.2015 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.03.2015 | Examination requested [2015/27] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.10.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.09.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/07] | 09.10.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/07] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.09.2017 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   11.04.2016 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2005121415 (AMMONO SP ZOO [PL], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-19 * pages 6,11,22 * * pages 24,34,44 *; | [X]WO2009149300 (SIXPOINT MATERIALS [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-19 * pages 2, 10; example 15; claim 42 *; | [X]WO2009151642 (SIXPOINT MATERIALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5-19 * paragraph [0127] - paragraph [0139] *; | [I]WO2007133512 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [I] 1,2,8-10 * pages 2-3, 10, * * pages 14-15 * | Examination | - POLYAKOV A Y ET AL, "Electrical properties and defect states in undoped high-resistivity GaN films used in high-power rectifiers", JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY B: MICROELECTRONICSPROCESSING AND PHENOMENA, AMERICAN VACUUM SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (20000501), vol. 18, no. 3, doi:10.1116/1.591368, ISSN 0734-211X, pages 1237 - 1243, XP012008181 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1116/1.591368 | - J. IBÁÑEZ ET AL, "Optical characterisation of Bi-doped GaN films grown by molecular beam epitaxy", PHYSICA STATUS SOLIDI. A: APPLICATIONS AND MATERIALS SCIENCE, DE, (20050401), vol. 202, no. 5, doi:10.1002/pssa.200461411, ISSN 1862-6300, pages 850 - 853, XP055690716 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/pssa.200461411 | by applicant | US6656615 | US7132730 | US7160388 | WO2007008198 | WO2007117689 | US2007234946 | US7078731 | US7170095 |