EP2828569 - METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A DRIVE UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2017/19] |
Former [2015/05] | For all designated states Audi AG 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DOORN, René Zum Bildstock 7 74182 Obersulm-Willsbach / DE | [2015/05] | Representative(s) | Brandt, Kai Audi AG Patentabteilung I/EZ-1 85045 Ingolstadt / DE | [2015/05] | Application number, filing date | 13712139.8 | 18.03.2013 | [2017/19] | WO2013EP00813 | Priority number, date | DE20121005689 | 21.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012005689 | [2015/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2013139459 | Date: | 26.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2828569 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2828569 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F17C7/00 | [2015/05] | CPC: |
F17C7/00 (EP,US);
G05D16/204 (US);
F17C13/025 (US);
F17C13/026 (US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/04328 (EP,US);
H01M8/04373 (EP,US);
H01M8/04388 (EP,US);
H01M8/04753 (EP,US);
H01M8/04776 (EP,US);
F17C2201/058 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0138 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0146 (EP,US);
F17C2205/0326 (EP,US);
F17C2221/012 (EP,US);
F17C2221/033 (EP,US);
F17C2223/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2223/036 (EP,US);
F17C2225/0123 (EP,US);
F17C2225/036 (EP,US);
F17C2227/042 (EP,US);
F17C2250/032 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0426 (EP,US);
F17C2250/043 (EP,US);
F17C2250/0439 (EP,US);
F17C2250/072 (EP,US);
F17C2265/066 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0168 (US);
F17C2270/0178 (EP,US);
F17C2270/0184 (US);
F17C2270/0763 (US);
H01M2250/20 (EP,US);
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
Y02E60/32 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US);
Y02T90/40 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/05] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM VERSORGEN EINES ANTRIEBSAGGREGATS | [2015/05] | English: | METHOD FOR SUPPLYING A DRIVE UNIT | [2015/05] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DESTINÉ À ALIMENTER UN GROUPE D'ENTRAÎNEMENT | [2015/05] | Entry into regional phase | 21.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 21.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/05] | 03.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.12.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.03.2013 | AL | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | IT | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | MT | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.03.2013 | |
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.03.2013 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
IT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | CZ | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | DK | 10.05.2017 | |
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 10.05.2017 | |
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2006246177 (MIKI YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-10,13,14 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0010] , [0011] , [0015] , [0019] , [0020] , [0024] , [0025] , [0026] , [0027] , [0028] , [0064] - [0072] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0078] , [0079] , [0093] - [0095] - [0099] , [0104] * [I] 11,12,15; | [I]US2010193045 (XU HUANEN [CN]) [I] 1 * paragraphs [0001] , [0004] , [0022] - [0029] - [0037] , [0039] - [0040] *; | [A]DE112007002802T (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0012] - [0015] - [0020] , [0022] , [0024] , [0027] , [0029] - [0035] *; | [AD]DE102004037851 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0051] - [0054] - [0062] *; | [AD]DE102006031875 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]) [AD] 1-15 * paragraphs [0011] - [0014] * | by applicant | DE102004037851 | DE102006031875 | DE102005047972 |