EP2834284 - PHENANTHRO[9,10-B]FURAN POLYMERS AND SMALL MOLECULES FOR ELECTRONIC APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.03.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 07.04.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 19.08.2020 [2020/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [2017/19] |
Former [2015/07] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WELKER, Matthias 11 Rue des Rossignols 68220 Hésingue / FR | 02 /
SCHäFER, Thomas Weidweg 15 d CH-4410 Liestal / CH | 03 /
CHEBOTAREVA, Natalia 33 rue du Gehren F-68220 Hagenthal le Bas / FR | 04 /
DüBNER, Matthias Nordstrasse 397 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | 05 /
TURBIEZ, Mathieu G. R. 15 rue de petit Landau F-68170 Rixheim / FR | [2015/25] |
Former [2015/07] | 01 /
WELKER, Matthias 53 rue de Huningue F-68300 St. Louis / FR | ||
02 /
SCHäFER, Thomas Weidweg 15 d CH-4410 Liestal / CH | |||
03 /
CHEBOTAREVA, Natalia 33 rue du Gehren F-68220 Hagenthal le Bas / FR | |||
04 /
DüBNER, Matthias Nordstrasse 397 CH-8037 Zürich / CH | |||
05 /
TURBIEZ, Mathieu G. R. 15 rue de petit Landau F-68170 Rixheim / FR | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2017/19] |
Former [2015/07] | Leybach, Holger Hugo BASF Schweiz AG IP Department P.O. Box 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13712277.6 | 27.03.2013 | [2017/19] | WO2013EP56463 | Priority number, date | US201261618869P | 02.04.2012 Original published format: US 201261618869 P | EP20120162859 | 02.04.2012 Original published format: EP 12162859 | [2015/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013149897 | Date: | 10.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2834284 | Date: | 11.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2834284 | Date: | 10.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 10.10.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C08G61/12, C09K11/00, H01B1/00, H01L51/00 | [2015/07] | CPC: |
H01B1/127 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (KR);
C08G61/126 (US);
C07D405/14 (EP,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,US);
C07D519/00 (EP,US);
C08G61/125 (EP,US);
C08L65/00 (KR);
C09B57/00 (EP,US);
C09B57/004 (EP,US);
C09B69/109 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
H01B1/00 (KR);
H01B1/128 (EP,US);
H10K30/30 (EP,US);
H10K71/12 (US);
H10K85/113 (EP,US);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K85/655 (EP,US);
H10K85/6572 (EP,US);
H10K85/6574 (EP,US);
H10K99/00 (KR);
C08G2261/12 (US);
C08G2261/124 (EP,US);
C08G2261/1412 (EP,US);
C08G2261/148 (EP,US);
C08G2261/18 (US);
C08G2261/3222 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3223 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3241 (US);
C08G2261/3242 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3243 (EP,US);
C08G2261/3246 (EP,US);
C08G2261/344 (EP,US);
C08G2261/364 (EP,US);
C08G2261/411 (EP,US);
C08G2261/91 (EP,US);
C08G2261/92 (EP,US);
C08G2261/95 (EP,US);
C09K2211/145 (EP,US);
H10K10/46 (US);
H10K10/484 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PHENANTHRO[9,10-B]FURANPOLYMERE UND KLEINE MOLEKÜLE FÜR ELEKTRONISCHE ANWENDUNGEN | [2015/07] | English: | PHENANTHRO[9,10-B]FURAN POLYMERS AND SMALL MOLECULES FOR ELECTRONIC APPLICATIONS | [2015/07] | French: | POLYMÈRES PHÉNANTHRO [9,10-B] FURAN ET PETITES MOLÉCULES POUR APPLICATIONS ÉLECTRONIQUES | [2016/43] |
Former [2015/07] | POLYMÈRES DE PHÉNANTHRO[9,10-B]FURANNE ET PETITES MOLÉCULES POUR DES APPLICATIONS ÉLECTRONIQUES | Entry into regional phase | 03.11.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.11.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.11.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.11.2014 | Examination requested [2015/07] | 13.05.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 28.02.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 28.02.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 13.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.03.2013 | AL | 10.05.2017 | AT | 10.05.2017 | CY | 10.05.2017 | CZ | 10.05.2017 | DK | 10.05.2017 | EE | 10.05.2017 | ES | 10.05.2017 | FI | 10.05.2017 | HR | 10.05.2017 | LT | 10.05.2017 | LV | 10.05.2017 | MC | 10.05.2017 | MK | 10.05.2017 | NL | 10.05.2017 | PL | 10.05.2017 | PT | 10.05.2017 | RO | 10.05.2017 | RS | 10.05.2017 | SE | 10.05.2017 | SI | 10.05.2017 | SK | 10.05.2017 | SM | 10.05.2017 | TR | 10.05.2017 | BG | 10.08.2017 | NO | 10.08.2017 | GR | 11.08.2017 | IS | 10.09.2017 | [2020/34] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CY | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
MK | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 27.03.2013 | |
AT | 10.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PT | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2020/15] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
TR | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
MC | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SI | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
SM | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
CZ | 10.05.2017 | ||
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RO | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
SK | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
DK | 10.05.2017 | ||
EE | 10.05.2017 | ||
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
NL | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
LV | 10.05.2017 | ||
PL | 10.05.2017 | ||
RS | 10.05.2017 | ||
SE | 10.05.2017 | ||
BG | 10.08.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 10.05.2017 | |
ES | 10.05.2017 | ||
FI | 10.05.2017 | ||
HR | 10.05.2017 | ||
LT | 10.05.2017 | ||
NO | 10.08.2017 | ||
GR | 11.08.2017 | ||
IS | 10.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006097419 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2007090773 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008031743 (CIBA SC HOLDING AG [CH], et al); | [A]WO2008119666 (CIBA HOLDING INC [CH], et al); | [A]WO2010136353 (BASF SE [DE], et al); | by applicant | US5077142 | EP1067165 | US6451459 | US2003021913 | WO03052841 | US6690029 | WO2004101581 | US6828044 | WO2004112161 | WO2005049695 | US2006013549 | WO2006097419 | US7183010 | US2007079867 | WO2007082584 | WO2007090773 | WO2008000664 | WO2008001123 | WO2008031743 | WO2008107089 | WO2008119666 | EP2034537 | WO2009047104 | EP2075274 | WO2010049321 | WO2010049323 | WO2010108873 | WO2010115767 | WO2010136353 | WO2010136352 | US2010326225 | WO2011137157 | WO2011EP57878 | WO2011EP67255 | WO2012EP61777 | WO2012EP66941 |