Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014154260 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP56491 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9530588 | Global Dossier | 27.12.2016 | B2 | US2016035509 | 04.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP56491 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105393326B | Global Dossier | 03.10.2017 | B | CN105393326 | 09.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP56491 | 27.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2979291 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B1 | EP2979291 | 03.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2013EP56491 | 27.03.2013 |