EP2809446 - METHOD FOR FINE GRINDING CARBON MATERIAL, INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUSLY PROCESSING BIOMASS AND APPLICATION FOR ITS GASIFICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2014/50] | METHOD FOR FINELY GRINDING A FEED OF CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, CONTINUOUS BIOMASS PROCESSING FACILITY, AND ASSOCIATED GASIFICATION APPLICATION | ||
[2019/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.02.2021 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.03.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Commissariat à l'Énergie Atomique et aux Énergies Alternatives Bâtiment le Ponant D 25 rue Leblanc 75015 Paris / FR | [2014/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHATAING, Thierry 129 Impasse les Jailleux F-38250 Lans-en-vercors / FR | 02 /
BAUW, Clément 23 rue Jean Baptiste Lebas F-59910 Bondues / FR | 03 /
MELKIOR, Thierry 35 rue Jean Moulin F-38360 Sassenage / FR | [2014/50] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/17] | Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2014/50] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13712910.2 | 01.02.2013 | [2020/17] | WO2013IB50862 | Priority number, date | FR20120051028 | 03.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251028 | [2014/50] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013114327 | Date: | 08.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2809446 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.08.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2014/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2809446 | Date: | 22.04.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B02C19/16, B02C21/00, B02C23/06 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
B02C19/16 (EP);
B02C21/007 (EP);
B02C23/06 (EP);
C10L5/366 (EP);
C10L5/447 (EP);
Y02E50/10 (EP);
Y02E50/30 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/50] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FEINZERKLEINERUNG VON KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEM MATERIAL, ANLAGE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN VERARBEITUNG VON BIOMASSE UND ANWENDUNG ZUR VERGASUNG | [2020/03] | English: | METHOD FOR FINE GRINDING CARBON MATERIAL, INSTALLATION FOR CONTINUOUSLY PROCESSING BIOMASS AND APPLICATION FOR ITS GASIFICATION | [2019/48] | French: | PROCEDE DE BROYAGE FIN D'UNE CHARGE DE MATIERE CARBONEE, INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT EN CONTINU DE BIOMASSE ET APPLICATION A LA GAZEIFICATION ASSOCIEE | [2019/48] |
Former [2014/50] | VERFAHREN ZUR FEINMAHLUNG EINES ROHSTOFFS AUS EINEM KOHLENSTOFFHALTIGEN MATERIAL, ANLAGE ZUR KONTINUIERLICHEN BIOMASSENVERARBEITUNG UND ZUGEHÖRIGE GASIFIZIERUNGSANWENDUNG | ||
Former [2014/50] | METHOD FOR FINELY GRINDING A FEED OF CARBONACEOUS MATERIAL, CONTINUOUS BIOMASS PROCESSING FACILITY, AND ASSOCIATED GASIFICATION APPLICATION | ||
Former [2014/50] | PROCÉDÉ DE BROYAGE FIN D'UNE CHARGE DE MATIÈRE CARBONÉE, INSTALLATION DE TRAITEMENT EN CONTINU DE BIOMASSE ET APPLICATION A LA GAZÉIFICATION ASSOCIÉE | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.08.2013 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 03.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/50] | 23.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.03.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.12.2019 | Opposition(s) | 25.01.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.02.2013 | AL | 22.04.2020 | AT | 22.04.2020 | CY | 22.04.2020 | CZ | 22.04.2020 | EE | 22.04.2020 | ES | 22.04.2020 | HR | 22.04.2020 | IT | 22.04.2020 | LT | 22.04.2020 | LV | 22.04.2020 | MC | 22.04.2020 | MK | 22.04.2020 | PL | 22.04.2020 | RO | 22.04.2020 | RS | 22.04.2020 | SE | 22.04.2020 | SI | 22.04.2020 | SK | 22.04.2020 | SM | 22.04.2020 | BG | 22.07.2020 | NO | 22.07.2020 | GR | 23.07.2020 | IS | 22.08.2020 | PT | 24.08.2020 | [2024/22] |
Former [2023/30] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CY | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2023/27] | HU | 01.02.2013 | |
AL | 22.04.2020 | ||
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/41] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
MC | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/24] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SI | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/10] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
PL | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SK | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/09] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
AT | 22.04.2020 | ||
CZ | 22.04.2020 | ||
EE | 22.04.2020 | ||
ES | 22.04.2020 | ||
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
IT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RO | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
SM | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/04] | AL | 22.04.2020 | |
HR | 22.04.2020 | ||
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2021/01] | HR | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
BG | 22.07.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/51] | HR | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
RS | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/50] | HR | 22.04.2020 | |
LT | 22.04.2020 | ||
LV | 22.04.2020 | ||
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
GR | 23.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/48] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
SE | 22.04.2020 | ||
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
PT | 24.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/47] | LT | 22.04.2020 | |
NO | 22.07.2020 | ||
IS | 22.08.2020 | ||
Former [2020/46] | IS | 22.08.2020 | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2001016467 (WEICHERT REINER [DE]) [X] 16-20 * the whole document * [Y] 1-15; | [Y]WO02083313 (MILLER MARKUS [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * page 1, line 5 - line 7 * * page 1, line 17 - line 30 * * page 2, line 8 - line 19 *; | [AD]US2008116118 (ZHU JINGXU [CA], et al) [AD] 1,8,16 * abstract ** figures 2-8 *; | [A]US2011057060 (SPROUSE KENNETH M [US]) [A] 1,8,16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6833185 | US2008116118 | - SUSANNE PAULRUD; JAN ERIK MATTSSON; CALLE NILSSON, "Particle and handling characteristics of wood fuel powder: effects of different mills", FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, (200112), vol. 76, pages 23 - 39 | - LUKAS KRATKY; TOMAS, "Biomass Size Reduction Machines for Enhancing Biogas Production", CHEM. ENG. TECHNOLPGY, (2011), vol. 34, no. 3, pages 391 - 399 | - NOBUSUKE KOBAYASHI; PIAO GUILIN; JUN KOBAYASHI; SHIGENOBU HATANO; YOSHINORI ITAYA; SHIGEKATSU MORI, "A new pulverized biomass utilization technology", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 180, doi:doi:10.1016/j.powtec.2007.02.041, pages 272 - 283, XP022406245 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2007.02.041 | - MOHAMMAD ZULFIQAR; BEHDAD MOGHTADERI; TERRY F, "Flow properties of biomass and coal blends", WALL FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 87, pages 281 - 288 | - JC WILLIAMS, "Mixing and segregation in powders", PRINCIPLES OF POWDER TECHNOLOGIES | - "Fragmentation - Aspect théorique", TECHNIQUES DE L'INGéNIEUR [J 3 050 | - "Fragmentation - Technologie", TECHNIQUES DE L'INGéNIEUR [J 3 O51 | - B. ARIAS; C. PEVIDA; J. FERMOSO; M.G. PLAZA; F. RUBIERA; J.J. PIS, "Influence of torrefaction on the grindability and reactivity of woody biomass", FUEL PROCESSING TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 89, doi:doi:10.1016/j.fuproc.2007.09.002, pages 169 - 175, XP022432427 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.fuproc.2007.09.002 | - D'ESTEBAN ET CARRASCO, "Evaluation of different strategies for pulverization of forest biomasses", POWDER TECHNOLOGY, (2006), vol. 166, doi:doi:10.1016/j.powtec.2006.05.018, pages 139 - 151, XP025124521 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.powtec.2006.05.018 | - SIYI LUO; CHANG LIU; BO XIAO; LEI XIAO, "A novel biomass pulverization technology", RENEWABLE ENERGY, (2011), vol. 36, pages 578 - 582, XP027383553 | - DUPONT; CAPUCINE; ROUGE; SYLVIE; BERTHELOT; ALAIN; PEREZ; DENILSON DA SILVA; GRAFFIN; AMBROISE, "Bioenergy II: Suitability of Wood Chips and Various Biomass Types for Use in Plant of BtL Production by Gasification", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CHEMICAL REACTOR ENGINEERING, (2010), vol. 8, no. A74 |