EP2820493 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL-TIME PERFORMANCE DEGRADATION ADVISORY FOR CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 05.08.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.11.2018 | Refusal of application | published on 19.12.2018 [2018/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nuovo Pignone S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci 2 50127 Florence / IT | [2015/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SARAVANAPRIYAN, Arul c/o GE Oil and Gas Engineering Department Doha / QA | 02 /
KHALIDI, Abdurrahman Abdallah Najma Road Intersection Doha / QA | 03 /
DI PILLO, Pier Luigi c/o Nuovo Pignone S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci 2 I-50127 Firenze / IT | 04 /
ASHOUR, Osama Naim P.O. Box 24997 Doha / QA | 05 /
STRINGANO, Giuseppe c/o Nuovo Pignone S.r.l. Via Felice Matteucci 2 I-50127 Firenze / IT | [2015/02] | Representative(s) | Illingworth-Law, William Illingworth GPO Europe GE International Inc. The Ark 201 Talgarth Road Hammersmith London W6 8BJ / GB | [2015/02] | Application number, filing date | 13713090.2 | 01.03.2013 | WO2013EP54158 | Priority number, date | IT2012CO00008 | 01.03.2012 Original published format: IT CO20120008 | [2015/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013127996 | Date: | 06.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2820493 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.09.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G05B23/02 | [2015/02] | CPC: |
G05B23/0216 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G01M15/14 (RU,US);
G05B19/0421 (CN);
G05B23/0245 (RU,US);
F01D21/003 (RU,US);
F02C7/00 (EP,CN,RU,US);
F04B51/00 (RU,US);
G01K13/00 (RU,US);
G01L3/10 (RU,US);
G05B11/06 (RU,US);
G05B23/0218 (EP,CN,RU,US);
G05B23/0235 (CN);
G05B23/0272 (CN);
G05B23/0283 (RU,US);
H04L67/10 (US);
F01D21/12 (RU);
F02C9/00 (RU);
F05D2260/80 (EP,CN,US);
G05B2219/25315 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/02] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR ECHTZEIT-WARNUNG VOR LEISTUNGSVERSCHLECHTERUNG FÜR ZENTRIFUGALVERDICHTER | [2015/02] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR REAL-TIME PERFORMANCE DEGRADATION ADVISORY FOR CENTRIFUGAL COMPRESSORS | [2015/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE MISE EN GARDE EN TEMPS RÉEL DE LA DÉGRADATION DE LA PERFORMANCE POUR DES COMPRESSEURS CENTRIFUGES | [2015/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.10.2014 | National basic fee paid | 01.10.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.10.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.10.2014 | Examination requested [2015/02] | 23.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.05.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2018 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2018/51] | 05.07.2018 | Date of oral proceedings | 06.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2018/51] | 06.08.2018 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.05.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.04.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2008243352 (HEALY TIMOTHY ANDREW [US]); | [A]DE102010026678 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); |