EP2839349 - WIRELESS FIELD DEVICE HAVING A RECONFIGURABLE DISCRETE INPUT/OUTPUT CHANNEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.12.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.07.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 8200 Market Boulevard Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | [2015/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOHNSON, James 13667 Ashcroft Road Savage, MN 55378 / US | 02 /
NELSON, Richard 1070 Lyman Court Chanhassen, MN 55317 / US | 03 /
WEINBERGER, Robert, M. 16831 Whitewood Avenue Prior Lake, MN 55372-9131 / US | [2015/09] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [2018/02] |
Former [2015/09] | Bohnenberger, Johannes Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13713268.4 | 07.03.2013 | [2018/02] | WO2013US29491 | Priority number, date | US201213450955 | 19.04.2012 Original published format: US201213450955 | [2015/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2013158231 | Date: | 24.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2839349 | Date: | 25.02.2015 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2013 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2015/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2839349 | Date: | 10.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.10.2013 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042 | [2015/09] | CPC: |
G05B19/0423 (EP,US);
G05B19/042 (RU);
G05B19/048 (US);
G05B19/054 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DRAHTLOSE FELDVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM UMKONFIGURIERBAREN DISKRETEN EIN-/AUSGABEKANAL | [2015/09] | English: | WIRELESS FIELD DEVICE HAVING A RECONFIGURABLE DISCRETE INPUT/OUTPUT CHANNEL | [2015/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CHAMP SANS FIL COMPRENANT UN CANAL D'ENTRÉE/SORTIE DISCRÈTE RECONFIGURABLE | [2015/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2014 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2014 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2014 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2014 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division to which search results under Rule 164(2) EPC are annexed (Time limit: M04) [2015/43] | 22.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.07.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 04.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | 11.10.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.03.2013 | AL | 10.01.2018 | AT | 10.01.2018 | CY | 10.01.2018 | CZ | 10.01.2018 | DK | 10.01.2018 | EE | 10.01.2018 | ES | 10.01.2018 | FI | 10.01.2018 | HR | 10.01.2018 | IT | 10.01.2018 | LT | 10.01.2018 | LV | 10.01.2018 | MC | 10.01.2018 | MK | 10.01.2018 | NL | 10.01.2018 | PL | 10.01.2018 | PT | 10.01.2018 | RO | 10.01.2018 | RS | 10.01.2018 | SE | 10.01.2018 | SI | 10.01.2018 | SK | 10.01.2018 | SM | 10.01.2018 | TR | 10.01.2018 | IE | 07.03.2018 | LU | 07.03.2018 | MT | 07.03.2018 | FR | 10.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | BG | 10.04.2018 | NO | 10.04.2018 | GR | 11.04.2018 | IS | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 07.03.2013 | |
AL | 10.01.2018 | ||
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PT | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
TR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
MT | 07.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
FR | 10.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SI | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
IE | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
LU | 07.03.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
MC | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
SM | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
DK | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
SK | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
EE | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RO | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
IT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 10.01.2018 | |
AT | 10.01.2018 | ||
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
BG | 10.04.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 10.01.2018 | |
CY | 10.01.2018 | ||
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
LV | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
RS | 10.01.2018 | ||
SE | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
IS | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
GR | 11.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
ES | 10.01.2018 | ||
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
PL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 10.01.2018 | |
FI | 10.01.2018 | ||
HR | 10.01.2018 | ||
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | FI | 10.01.2018 | |
LT | 10.01.2018 | ||
NL | 10.01.2018 | ||
NO | 10.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [X]US8149102 (MILLER MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-5,11-15* the whole document * | Examination | US2010318229 | US5731595 | US2007142934 |